MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY v. 9511 W DEPOT ST, LLC

Plaintiff: MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: 9511 W DEPOT ST, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02350
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLOSED DISMISSED - ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This matter came before the Court on the Notice of Dismissal filed herein by the Plaintiff. And the Court, being duly advised in the premises now finds that said dismissal should be granted #9 . IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED by the Court that this matter be, and it hereby is, dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/28/2019.(JDH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ruesch, Meghan)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by June 28, 2019, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendant is cautioned, however, that when it does respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that it denies any of Plaintiff's jurisdictional allegations or states that it does not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/14/2019.(JDH)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Other Affiliate RLI INSURANCE COMPANY for MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Ruesch, Meghan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 9511 W DEPOT ST, LLC. (REO)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Giordano on behalf of Plaintiff MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Eileen Ruesch on behalf of Plaintiff MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Ruesch, Meghan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 9511 W DEPOT ST, LLC, filed by MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5476115) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (MH Docs 0001-0064), #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruesch, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY v. 9511 W DEPOT ST, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Robert Giordano
Represented By: Meghan Eileen Ruesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9511 W DEPOT ST, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?