TOOLEY v. NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Defendant: ALPAGOT FAMILY LIVING TRUST, ALDI (INDIANA) L.P. and NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02363
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 27 Alpagot Family Living Trust's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by ALPAGOT FAMILY LIVING TRUST.(Overturf, Weston)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to 8/27/2019 for the Defendant New Castle ABG LLC to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/7/2019. (CBU)
August 5, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to August 27, 2019 to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Craig)
July 24, 2019 Filing 24 MARGINAL ENTRY Approving #23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Defendant Aldi is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/24/2019.(JRB)
July 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Peter Abernethy Morse, Jr withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/19/2019. (SWM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance (Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance), filed by Defendant ALDI (INDIANA) L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morse, Peter)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 11:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/16/2019.(CBU)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian C. Antkowiak on behalf of Defendant ALDI (INDIANA) L.P.. (Antkowiak, Christian)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALDI (INDIANA) L.P. identifying Corporate Parent ALDI, INC. for ALDI (INDIANA) L.P... (Morse, Peter)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ALDI (INDIANA) L.P.. (Morse, Peter)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Abernethy Morse, Jr on behalf of Defendant ALDI (INDIANA) L.P.. (Morse, Peter)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC. (Wiley, Craig)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC. (Wiley, Craig)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Wiley on behalf of Defendant NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC. (Wiley, Craig)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Ahonen on behalf of Defendant NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC. (Ahonen, Zachary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hamish S. Cohen on behalf of Defendant ALPAGOT FAMILY LIVING TRUST. (Cohen, Hamish)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ALPAGOT FAMILY LIVING TRUST. (Overturf, Weston)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Weston E. Overturf on behalf of Defendant ALPAGOT FAMILY LIVING TRUST. (Overturf, Weston)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. ALPAGOT FAMILY LIVING TRUST served on 6/19/2019. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. ALDI (INDIANA) L.P. served on 6/19/2019. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC served on 6/19/2019. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ALDI (INDIANA) L.P., ALPAGOT FAMILY LIVING TRUST, and NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC. (JRB)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Bohnet on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Bohnet, Eric)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALDI (INDIANA) L.P., ALPAGOT FAMILY LIVING TRUST, NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5477713) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOOLEY v. NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Represented By: Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALPAGOT FAMILY LIVING TRUST
Represented By: Hamish S. Cohen
Represented By: Weston E. Overturf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDI (INDIANA) L.P.
Represented By: Peter Abernethy Morse, Jr
Represented By: Christian C. Antkowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW CASTLE ABG, LLC
Represented By: Zachary A. Ahonen
Represented By: Craig W. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?