WILLIAMS v. SAUL
Plaintiff: CHARLES E. WILLIAMS
Defendant: COMM'R ANDREW M. SAUL and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv02436
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 6/19/2019. (JDC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Wambach on behalf of Plaintiff CHARLES E. WILLIAMS. (Wambach, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Frederick Richter on behalf of Plaintiff CHARLES E. WILLIAMS. (Richter, Matthew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Third MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff CHARLES E. WILLIAMS. (Richter, Matthew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by CHARLES E. WILLIAMS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMM'R ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES E. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Richter
Represented By: Joseph R. Wambach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?