DASILVA et al v. STATE OF INDIANA et al
Plaintiff: NIKI DASILVA, GABRIELLE MCLEMORE, SAMANTHA LOZANO and MARA REARDON
Defendant: CURTIS T. HILL, JR. and STATE OF INDIANA
Intervenor Defendant: Indiana House of Representatives and Indiana Senate
Case Number: 1:2019cv02453
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Stay re #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #38 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings , filed by Plaintiffs NIKI DASILVA, SAMANTHA LOZANO, GABRIELLE MCLEMORE, MARA REARDON. (Brinkerhoff, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DaSilva Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lozano Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - McLemore Notice)(Brinkerhoff, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Order re #36 MOTION TO STRIKE by CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Erdmann, Patricia) Modified on 8/16/2019 to create link to #36 (APD).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sua sponte now RESCHEDULES the Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for September 13, 2019 to September 20, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern). Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/15/2019.(SWM)
August 5, 2019 Filing 41 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #40 MOTION to Stay re #19 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant CURTIS T. HILL, JR. (Jensen, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Stay re #19 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant CURTIS T. HILL, JR. (Jensen, David)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO ENLARGE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS TO INTERVENE - Plaintiffs Niki DaSilva, Samantha Lozano, Gabrielle McLemore and Mara Candelaria Reardon (collectively, "Plaintiffs"), by counsel, having filed their Agreed Motion to Enlarge Deadline to Respond to Motions to Intervene, and the Court being duly advised hereby GRANTS said Motions. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs shall have up to and including August 19, 2019 to file their response, if any, to the Motions to Intervene filed by the Indiana House of Representatives and Indiana Senate. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 8/1/2019. (JDC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings, filed by Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Erdmann, Patricia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 37 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION to Strike #32 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #31 MOTION to Intervene , #27 Notice of Appearance, #28 Notice of Appearance, #29 MOTION to Intervene , #30 Brief/Memorandum in Support , filed by Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Erdmann, Patricia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Strike #32 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #31 MOTION to Intervene , #27 Notice of Appearance, #28 Notice of Appearance, #29 MOTION to Intervene , #30 Brief/Memorandum in Support , filed by Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Erdmann, Patricia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to August 19, 2019 re #31 MOTION to Intervene , #29 MOTION to Intervene Agreed Motion to Enlarge Deadline to Respond to Motions to Intervene, filed by Plaintiffs NIKI DASILVA, SAMANTHA LOZANO, GABRIELLE MCLEMORE, MARA REARDON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brinkerhoff, William)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO ENLARGE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND REPLY TO RESPONSES TO SAME - Plaintiffs Niki DaSilva, Samantha Lozano, Gabrielle McLemore and Mara Candelaria Reardon collectively, "Plaintiffs"), by counsel, having filed their Agreed Motion to Enlarge Deadline to Respond to Motions to Dismiss and Reply to Responses to Same, and the Court being duly advised hereby GRANTS said Motions. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs shall have up to and including August 15, 2019 to file their response to the Motions to Dismiss and Defendants shall have an additional (7) days (for a total of fourteen (14) days) to file a reply to Plaintiff's response to the Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 7/30/2019. (JDC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to August 15, 2019 re #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #16 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against the State of Indiana and the Attorney General in his Official Capacity Agreed Motion to Enlarge Deadline to Respond to Motions to Dismiss and Reply to Responses to Same, filed by Plaintiffs NIKI DASILVA, SAMANTHA LOZANO, GABRIELLE MCLEMORE, MARA REARDON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brinkerhoff, William)
July 22, 2019 Filing 32 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION to Intervene , filed by Intervenor Defendant Indiana Senate. (Zoeller, Susan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Intervene , filed by Intervenor Defendant Indiana Senate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Indiana Senates Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint and Other Defenses)(Zoeller, Susan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION to Intervene , filed by Intervenor Defendant Indiana House of Representatives. (Zoeller, Susan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Intervene , filed by Intervenor Defendant Indiana House of Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Indiana Houses Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint and Other Defenses)(Zoeller, Susan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin S. Schroeder on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Indiana House of Representatives, Indiana Senate. (Schroeder, Caitlin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Zoeller on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Indiana House of Representatives, Indiana Senate. (Zoeller, Susan)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 1:30 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/16/2019.(CBU)
July 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Durell Stamatakos on behalf of Defendant CURTIS T. HILL, JR. (Stamatakos, Alyssa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Roth on behalf of Defendant CURTIS T. HILL, JR. (Roth, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Twohy on behalf of Defendant CURTIS T. HILL, JR. (Twohy, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David Charles Jensen on behalf of Defendant CURTIS T. HILL, JR. (Jensen, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Feldt on behalf of Defendant CURTIS T. HILL, JR. (Feldt, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant CURTIS T. HILL, JR. (Jensen, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant CURTIS T. HILL, JR. (Jensen, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Charles Jensen on behalf of Defendant CURTIS T. HILL, JR. (Jensen, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against the State of Indiana and the Attorney General in his Official Capacity , filed by Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Erdmann, Patricia)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against the State of Indiana and the Attorney General in his Official Capacity, filed by Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Erdmann, Patricia)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Winston Lin on behalf of Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Lin, Winston)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Parvinder Kaur Nijjar on behalf of Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Nijjar, Parvinder) Modified on 7/11/2019 (JDC). created linked to dkt #7
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson S. Garn on behalf of Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Garn, Jefferson) Modified on 7/11/2019 (JDC). created linked to dkt #6 (JDC).
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Orloff Erdmann on behalf of Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Erdmann, Patricia) Modified on 7/11/2019 created linked to doc. #5 (JDC).
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. CURTIS T. HILL, JR served on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons & Affidavit of Service)(Jeselskis, Kimberly)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. STATE OF INDIANA served on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons & Affidavit of Service)(Jeselskis, Kimberly)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (MAC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Parvinder Kaur Nijjar on behalf of Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Nijjar, Parvinder)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson S. Garn on behalf of Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Garn, Jefferson)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Orloff Erdmann on behalf of Defendants CURTIS T. HILL, JR, STATE OF INDIANA. (Erdmann, Patricia)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Kaufman Joseph on behalf of Plaintiffs NIKI DASILVA, SAMANTHA LOZANO, GABRIELLE MCLEMORE, MARA REARDON. (Joseph, Hannah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Brinkerhoff on behalf of Plaintiffs NIKI DASILVA, SAMANTHA LOZANO, GABRIELLE MCLEMORE, MARA REARDON. (Brinkerhoff, William)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly D. Jeselskis on behalf of Plaintiffs NIKI DASILVA, SAMANTHA LOZANO, GABRIELLE MCLEMORE, MARA REARDON. (Jeselskis, Kimberly)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5484866) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DaSilva Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lozano Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - McLemore Notice, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Jeselskis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DASILVA et al v. STATE OF INDIANA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIKI DASILVA
Represented By: Kimberly D. Jeselskis
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIELLE MCLEMORE
Represented By: Kimberly D. Jeselskis
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA LOZANO
Represented By: Kimberly D. Jeselskis
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARA REARDON
Represented By: Kimberly D. Jeselskis
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTIS T. HILL, JR.
Represented By: Patricia Orloff Erdmann
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Winston Lin
Represented By: David Charles Jensen
Represented By: Alyssa Durell Stamatakos
Represented By: Michael Roth
Represented By: Robert J. Feldt
Represented By: John P. Twohy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Patricia Orloff Erdmann
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Winston Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Indiana House of Representatives
Represented By: Caitlin S. Schroeder
Represented By: Susan M. Zoeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Indiana Senate
Represented By: Caitlin S. Schroeder
Represented By: Susan M. Zoeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?