KLUGE v. BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: JOHN M. KLUGE
Defendant: BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, DR. JAMES SNAPP, PHIL UTTERBACK, DR. BRET DAGHE, JODI GORDON, BRET DAGHE and JAMES SNAPP
Case Number: 1:2019cv02462
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 9:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/30/2019.(CBU)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/9/2019 for the Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint #15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/29/2019. (CBU)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 Submission of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, re #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/09/2019 in which to #15 Amended Complaint , filed by Defendants BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, BRET DAGHE, JODI GORDON, JAMES SNAPP, PHIL UTTERBACK. (Borg, Brent)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/09/2019 in which to respond to #15 Amended Complaint , filed by Defendants BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, BRET DAGHE, JODI GORDON, JAMES SNAPP, PHIL UTTERBACK. (Borg, Brent) Modified on 7/26/2019 (JDH).
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by JOHN M. KLUGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Accommodation Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Conditional Resignation, Acceptance of Terms, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Rescission of Conditional Resignation, time stamped, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-BCSC Transgender Questions)(Green, Kevin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendants on June 24, 2019, filed by JOHN M. KLUGE. (Cork, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent R. Borg on behalf of Defendants BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, BRET DAGHE, JODI GORDON, JAMES SNAPP, PHIL UTTERBACK. (Borg, Brent)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, BRET DAGHE, JODI GORDON, JAMES SNAPP, PHIL UTTERBACK. (Borg, Brent)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Borg, Brent)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, REFILED AT #12 *** NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, BRET DAGHE, JODI GORDON, JAMES SNAPP, PHIL UTTERBACK. (Borg, Brent) Modified on 6/28/2019 (JDH).
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Phillip Pinegar on behalf of Defendants BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, BRET DAGHE, JODI GORDON, JAMES SNAPP, PHIL UTTERBACK. (Pinegar, Alexander)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ***FILING ERROR, WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED, REFILED AT #13 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Brent R. Borg on behalf of Defendants BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, BRET DAGHE, JODI GORDON, JAMES SNAPP, PHIL UTTERBACK. (Borg, Brent) Modified on 7/1/2019 (JDH).
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, BRET DAGHE, JODI GORDON, JAMES SNAPP, PHIL UTTERBACK. (REO)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Roscoe Stovall, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN M. KLUGE. (Stovall, Roscoe)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Edward Green on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN M. KLUGE. (Green, Kevin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Cork on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN M. KLUGE. (Cork, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOHN M. KLUGE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5486757) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cork, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLUGE v. BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Pinegar
Represented By: Brent R. Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. JAMES SNAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHIL UTTERBACK
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Pinegar
Represented By: Brent R. Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. BRET DAGHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JODI GORDON
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Pinegar
Represented By: Brent R. Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRET DAGHE
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Pinegar
Represented By: Brent R. Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES SNAPP
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Pinegar
Represented By: Brent R. Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN M. KLUGE
Represented By: Michael J. Cork
Represented By: Roscoe Stovall, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Edward Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?