UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HILBERT
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: LANEAL EDWARD HILBERT
Case Number: 1:2019cv02468
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. LANEAL EDWARD HILBERT served on 6/28/2019. (Childress, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to LANEAL EDWARD HILBERT. (DWH)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to LANEAL EDWARD HILBERT. (Childress, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Childress on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Childress, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LANEAL EDWARD HILBERT, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B- Real Estate Mortgage for Indiana, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Laneal E. Hilbert)(Childress, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANEAL EDWARD HILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John E. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?