BREHMER v. ROLLS-ROYCE, INC. et al

Plaintiff: MILTON BREHMER
Defendant: ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC. and ROLLS-ROYCE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02470
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by All Defendants.(McHone, Koryn)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 09:30 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/12/2019.(SWM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC., ROLLS-ROYCE, INC.. (McHone, Koryn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC., ROLLS-ROYCE, INC. identifying Corporate Parent ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS, INC. for ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC., ROLLS-ROYCE, INC... (McHone, Koryn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Koryn Michelle McHone on behalf of Defendants ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC., ROLLS-ROYCE, INC.. (McHone, Koryn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Anthony Prather on behalf of Defendants ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC., ROLLS-ROYCE, INC.. (Prather, R.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by MILTON BREHMER. ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC. served on 6/25/2019. (Haskin, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by MILTON BREHMER. ROLLS-ROYCE, INC. served on 6/25/2019. (Haskin, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC., ROLLS-ROYCE, INC. (MAC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Keenan D. Wilson on behalf of Plaintiff MILTON BREHMER. (Wilson, Keenan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff MILTON BREHMER. (Haskin, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by MILTON BREHMER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5488188) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BREHMER v. ROLLS-ROYCE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Koryn Michelle McHone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLLS-ROYCE, INC.
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Koryn Michelle McHone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILTON BREHMER
Represented By: Keenan D. Wilson
Represented By: John H. Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?