JOHNSON v. FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION

Plaintiff: MARTHA C JOHNSON and MARTHA C. JOHNSON
Defendant: FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02479
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Mahony, Marcia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff MARTHA C. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hahn, Stephanie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, filed by MARTHA C. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue)(Hahn, Stephanie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, filed by Defendant FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Mahony, Marcia)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by MARTHA C. JOHNSON. FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION served on 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons and Proof of Service)(Hahn, Stephanie)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed for counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/9/2019.(JRB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark McConnell Riffle on behalf of Defendant FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Riffle, Mark)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia A. Mahony on behalf of Defendant FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Mahony, Marcia)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (MAC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Jane Hahn on behalf of Plaintiff MARTHA C JOHNSON. (Hahn, Stephanie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Jury Trial against FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, filed by MARTHA C JOHNSON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5489038) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Hahn, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA C JOHNSON
Represented By: Stephanie Jane Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA C. JOHNSON
Represented By: Stephanie Jane Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANKLIN TOWNSHIP COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: Mark McConnell Riffle
Represented By: Marcia A. Mahony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?