SYSTEMS PLANT SERVICES, INC. v. HARRINGTON et al
Plaintiff: SYSTEMS PLANT SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: DAVID HARRINGTON and BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02544
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Parties' #18 Joint Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 9/23/2019 01:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/22/2019.(SWM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial Conference, filed by Defendants BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC, DAVID HARRINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foley, Donald)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 COUNTERCLAIM against SYSTEMS PLANT SERVICES, INC., filed by All Defendants.(Foley, Donald)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Foley, Donald)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/19/2019.(SWM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Tony H. Abbott hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Abbott, Tony)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Donald F. Foley hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Foley, Donald)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC. (Foley, Donald)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC. (LAB) (JRB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony H. Abbott on behalf of Defendants BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC, DAVID HARRINGTON. (Abbott, Tony)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC, DAVID HARRINGTON. (Foley, Donald)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald F. Foley on behalf of Defendants BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC, DAVID HARRINGTON. (Foley, Donald)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by SYSTEMS PLANT SERVICES, INC.. DAVID HARRINGTON served on 7/1/2019. (Zimmerly, Philip)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by SYSTEMS PLANT SERVICES, INC.. BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC served on 6/27/2019. (Zimmerly, Philip)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC and DAVID HARRINGTON. (JRB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SYSTEMS PLANT SERVICES, INC. d/b/a THE SYSTEMS GROUP. (Zimmerly, Philip)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R. Zimmerly on behalf of Plaintiff SYSTEMS PLANT SERVICES, INC. d/b/a THE SYSTEMS GROUP. (Zimmerly, Philip)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC, DAVID HARRINGTON, filed by SYSTEMS PLANT SERVICES, INC. d/b/a THE SYSTEMS GROUP. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5495409) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Zimmerly, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SYSTEMS PLANT SERVICES, INC. v. HARRINGTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID HARRINGTON
Represented By: Tony H. Abbott
Represented By: Donald F. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAIR MECHANICAL, LLC
Represented By: Tony H. Abbott
Represented By: Donald F. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYSTEMS PLANT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?