MCKINLEY v. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.
Plaintiff: ANN MCKINLEY
Defendant: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC and UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02548
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/30/2019.(CBU)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service Inc., (Delaware) for UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC... (Mosby, Brian)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.. (Mosby, Brian)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lee Mosby on behalf of Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.. (Mosby, Brian)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Tschanz on behalf of Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.. (Tschanz, Peter)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. (REO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Quincy Erica Sauer on behalf of Plaintiff ANN MCKINLEY. (Sauer, Quincy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ANN MCKINLEY, filed by ANN MCKINLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5495565) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Sauer, Quincy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCKINLEY v. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.
Represented By: Brian Lee Mosby
Represented By: Peter T. Tschanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN MCKINLEY
Represented By: Quincy Erica Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?