NUNALLY et al v. MORRIS et al
Plaintiff: MARLA L. NUNALLY, MICHAEL S. NUNALLY and MARLA NUNALLY, LLC
Defendant: DAVE KOEHN, BLUE SKY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC, PAM STRICKLAND, KATE FREDERICO, MORRIS INVEST, LLC, CLAYTON MORRIS, NICOLE MECKLEY, STEVE ROGERS and LINZI DEL CONTE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02568
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- N Eucid Property, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-N Gail Property, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Nolan Property, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-N Colorado Property, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-N Rural Property, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-N Emerson Property, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-Tacoma Property, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H-Ethel Property, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I-Chester Property, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J-Vermont Property, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K- 2953 N Eucid Property, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L-Station Property)(Dillman, Lisa)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MARGINAL ENTRY denying Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. This proposed amended complaint still does not set forth the citizenship (as opposed to residency) of all Defendants. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint consistent with this order and the order at Filing No. 7 by August 14, 2019. No motion is needed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/7/2019. (SWM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Damages and Request for Jury Trial, filed by Plaintiffs MARLA NUNALLY, LLC, MARLA L. NUNALLY, MICHAEL S. NUNALLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-L to Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Leave File First Amended Complaint for Damages and Request for Jury Trial)(Dillman, Lisa)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiffs must file an Amended Complaint to correct the jurisdictional insufficiencies noted above, including pleading residency rather than citizenship, failing to sufficiently allege the citizenship of all layers of LLCs, and pleading based on "information and belief." These insufficiencies are repeated throughout the complaint. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are directed to file an Amended Complaint sufficiently pleading this Court's diversity jurisdiction no later than July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 7/8/2019.(JDC)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jynell D. Berkshire on behalf of Plaintiffs MARLA NUNALLY, LLC, MARLA L. NUNALLY, MICHAEL S. NUNALLY. (Berkshire, Jynell)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BLUE SKY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINZI DEL CONTE, KATE FREDERICO, DAVE KOEHN, NICOLE MECKLEY, CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC, STEVE ROGERS, PAM STRICKLAND. (REO)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Dillman on behalf of Plaintiffs MARLA NUNALLY, LLC, MARLA L. NUNALLY, MICHAEL S. NUNALLY. (Dillman, Lisa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5497431) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - N. Euclid Property, #4 Exhibit B - N. Gale Property, #5 Exhibit C - Nolan Property, #6 Exhibit D - N. Colorado Property, #7 Exhibit E - N. Rural Property, #8 Exhibit F - N. Emerson Property, #9 Exhibit G - Tacoma Property, #10 Exhibit H - Ethel Property, #11 Exhibit I - Chester Property, #12 Exhibit J - Vermont Property, #13 Exhibit K- 2953 N. Euclid Property, #14 Exhibit L - Station Property)(Dillman, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NUNALLY et al v. MORRIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE KOEHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE SKY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM STRICKLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATE FREDERICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRIS INVEST, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYTON MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE MECKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINZI DEL CONTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLA L. NUNALLY
Represented By: Lisa M. Dillman
Represented By: Jynell D. Berkshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL S. NUNALLY
Represented By: Lisa M. Dillman
Represented By: Jynell D. Berkshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLA NUNALLY, LLC
Represented By: Lisa M. Dillman
Represented By: Jynell D. Berkshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?