STANISIC v. ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LENKO STANISIC
Defendant: BIOMET, INC., BIOMET MANUFACTURING, LLC, M.D. JOHN CUCKLER, BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, ALABAMA MEDICAL CONSULTANTS, INC., ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC., BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC and JOHN CUCKLER
Case Number: 1:2019cv02586
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 Transfer Letter to the Clerk of the Marion County Court. Copies of case documents and docket enclosed. (NAD)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLOSED REMANDED - This matter has come before the Court on the Parties' #15 Joint Stipulation to Remand. The Court, having reviewed the Joint Stipulation to Remand and being otherwise duly advised, finds that the relief sought by the Parties should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-captioned matter be remanded to the Marion County Superior Court, Civil Division 12. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/3/2019.(NAD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Remand to Marion County Superior Court, filed by Defendants ALABAMA MEDICAL CONSULTANTS, INC., BIOMET MANUFACTURING, LLC, BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC, BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, BIOMET, INC., JOHN CUCKLER, ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Remand)(Campbell, Andrew)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY ON JURISDICTION - The Notice of Removal is deficient regarding the citizenship of "the Zimmer Biomet Defendants" because it states, "All of the Zimmer Biomet Defendants are Indiana entities with their principal places of business located in Indiana." (Filing No. 1 at 2.) This allegation is deficient because it fails to allege the identity of the members of the Defendant limited liability companies and those members' citizenship. Therefore, the Defendants are ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify the citizenship of each of the Zimmer Biomet Defendants. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/1/2019.(NAD)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. Judge James Patrick Hanlon is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-02586-TWP-DML, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/26/2019. (PKP)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Tanner on behalf of Defendants ALABAMA MEDICAL CONSULTANTS, INC., BIOMET MANUFACTURING, LLC, BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC, BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, BIOMET, INC., JOHN CUCKLER, ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.. (Tanner, John)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Kelver Hall on behalf of Defendants ALABAMA MEDICAL CONSULTANTS, INC., BIOMET MANUFACTURING, LLC, BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC, BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, BIOMET, INC., JOHN CUCKLER, ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.. (Hall, Angela)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.. (Campbell, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIOMET, INC. identifying Corporate Parent ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. for BIOMET, INC... (Campbell, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. for BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC.. (Campbell, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. for BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC.. (Campbell, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIOMET MANUFACTURING, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. for BIOMET MANUFACTURING, LLC.. (Campbell, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALABAMA MEDICAL CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Campbell, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Lorin Campbell on behalf of Defendants ALABAMA MEDICAL CONSULTANTS, INC., BIOMET MANUFACTURING, LLC, BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC, BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, BIOMET, INC., JOHN CUCKLER, ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.. (Campbell, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D12-1906-CT-023442, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5498544) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint)(Campbell, Andrew) Modified on 6/26/2019 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STANISIC v. ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOMET, INC.
Represented By: Andrew Lorin Campbell
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOMET MANUFACTURING, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lorin Campbell
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. JOHN CUCKLER
Represented By: Andrew Lorin Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lorin Campbell
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALABAMA MEDICAL CONSULTANTS, INC.
Represented By: Andrew Lorin Campbell
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Andrew Lorin Campbell
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lorin Campbell
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CUCKLER
Represented By: Andrew Lorin Campbell
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENKO STANISIC
Represented By: Edward B. Mulligan, V
Represented By: Gregory L. Laker
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?