THOMAS v. SANDERSON et al
Plaintiff: LENDON THOMAS
Defendant: WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC. and MARY L. SANDERSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv02648
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Notice of Removal, re #1 Notice of Removal, #9 Order, filed by Plaintiff LENDON THOMAS. (Clay, Caroline)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - More than 30 days have passed since the filing of the notice of removal, yet Plaintiff has not moved to remand or filed a response. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by August 23, 2019 (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/9/2019.(DWH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Foos on behalf of Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Submission of Exhibit A: Complaint and State Court Record, filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance, Subpoena/Summons, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Jury Demand, Order on MET and Amended Appearances (2)))(Foos, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bartholomew County Circuit Court, case number 03C01-1904-CT-002268, filed by WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5503403) (Foos, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. SANDERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY L. SANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENDON THOMAS
Represented By: Scott A. Weathers
Represented By: Caroline Bonnie Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?