KENDRICK v. CAPPA et al
Plaintiff: MARK E. KENDRICK
Defendant: JEFF CAPPA, JASON WYSONG, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, DAVE LIMBURG, JOHN AND JANE DOES, ANDREW ABNEY-BROTZ, BROWN and SMITH
Case Number: 1:2019cv02672
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on #5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #5 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Sixteen Dollars and Eighty-Seven Cents ($16.87). The plaintiff shall have through August 19, 2019, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/25/2019. (NAD)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff MARK E. KENDRICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FFF - Court Certification, #2 Envelope)(NAD)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order - Granting #2 Motion for Forms.The plaintiff's June 25, 2019, letter, docketed as a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, is construed as a motion for forms. That motion, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that the clerk is directed to include one copy of the Prisoner Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee form and one copy of the Prisoner Complaint Form with the plaintiff's copy of this Order. Copies to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/2/2019. (NAD)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Forms (Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis), filed by Plaintiff MARK E. KENDRICK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH) Modified on 7/3/2019 (MEH).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW ABNEY-BROTZ, BROWN, JEFF CAPPA, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JOHN AND JANE DOES, DAVE LIMBURG, SMITH, JASON WYSONG, filed by MARK E. KENDRICK. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits including Affidavit, Invoice, grievance procedures, medical records, messages, #2 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENDRICK v. CAPPA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF CAPPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON WYSONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE LIMBURG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW ABNEY-BROTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK E. KENDRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?