LANDMARK AT LOCKERBIE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. v. TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: LANDMARK AT LOCKERBIE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv02677
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Laura Sue Reed hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. Address Change Only. (Reed, Laura)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2019 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/23/2019.(SWM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Beyers on behalf of Plaintiff LANDMARK AT LOCKERBIE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Beyers, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(Reed, Laura)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corporation, Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.. (Reed, Laura)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Sue Reed on behalf of Defendant TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Reed, Laura)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion, case number 49D12-1905-PL-020963, filed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5505242) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record (Docket Sheet; Summons and Complaint; Appearances; and Notice of Time), #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reed, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANDMARK AT LOCKERBIE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. v. TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Laura Sue Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANDMARK AT LOCKERBIE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: William David Beyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?