DAVIS v. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY a/k/a GEICO
Plaintiff: RACHEL R. DAVIS
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a GEICO and GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02723
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses, filed by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY.(McDermott, Brian)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/7/2019.(JRB)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Leeann Pels Simpkins on behalf of Defendant GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Simpkins, Leeann)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge James Patrick Hanlon. Judge James R. Sweeney II is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-02723-JPH-MPB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 8/7/2019. (BRR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY. (McDermott, Brian)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY for GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (McDermott, Brian)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. McDermott on behalf of Defendant GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY. (McDermott, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by RACHEL R. DAVIS. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 7/11/2019. (Kondras, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY. (NLR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff RACHEL R. DAVIS. (Kondras, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a GEICO, filed by RACHEL R. DAVIS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5511342) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY a/k/a GEICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL R. DAVIS
Represented By: Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a GEICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Brian L. McDermott
Represented By: Leeann Pels Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?