CITY OF SOUTH BEND et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: CITY OF SOUTH BEND and SOUTH BEND REDEVELOPMENT COMMISSION
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02732
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion (Notice of Removal), filed by Plaintiffs CITY OF SOUTH BEND, SOUTH BEND REDEVELOPMENT COMMISSION. (Nguyen, Thao)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - More than 30 days have passed since the filing of the notice of removal, yet Plaintiffs have not moved to remand or filed a response. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by August 23, 2019 (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/9/2019.(DWH)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jared K. Markowitz for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/15/2019. (JRB)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Wayne R. Glaubinger for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/15/2019. (JRB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Wayne Glaubinger to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5525253), filed by Defendant LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Uyhelji, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jared Markowitz to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5525209), filed by Defendant LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Uyhelji, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Jacob Gardner on behalf of Defendant LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Gardner, Martin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.(Uyhelji, Christopher)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Submission of State Court Records from Marion Superior Court in Case Number 49D05-1906-PL-023299. (Attachments: #1 Envelopes (6))(DJH)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE -TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on SEPTEMBER 23, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed for counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/9/2019.(JRB)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC, Corporate Parent AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY INC., Corporate Parent AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY U.S., INC. for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Uyhelji, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Uyhelji on behalf of Defendant LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Uyhelji, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, Civil Division 5, case number 49D05-1906-PL-023299, filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5512367) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record State Court Records (Docket Sheet, Appearance for Plaintiff, Summons, Proof of Service, Appearance for Defendant), #3 State Court Record Complaint with Exhibits)(Uyhelji, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF SOUTH BEND et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF SOUTH BEND
Represented By: Sean M. Hirschten
Represented By: Thao Trong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH BEND REDEVELOPMENT COMMISSION
Represented By: Sean M. Hirschten
Represented By: Thao Trong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher J. Uyhelji
Represented By: Jared K. Markowitz
Represented By: Martin Jacob Gardner
Represented By: Wayne R. Glaubinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?