KEEYLEN v. RIGGS et al
Plaintiff: VICTOR KEEYLEN
Defendant: ANDRE STRONG, CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS/STATE OF INDIANA, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT., GARY RIGGS and METRO DRUG TASK FORCE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02824
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIPT #IP066527 for partial filing fee in the amount of $3.47, paid by Plaintiff. (DJH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff VICTOR KEEYLEN. (DWH)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - Mr. Keeylan's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #4 , is GRANTED to the extent that he is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $3.47. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). He shall have through September 16, 2019 to pay this initial partial filing fee to the clerk of the district court. While Mr. Keeylan is excused from prepaying the full filing fee, he still must pay the $350.00 filing fee under the statutory formula set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) ("[T]he prisoner shall be required to pay the full amount of a filing fee."). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/15/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff VICTOR KEEYLEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Prisoner Account and Transaction History)(DWH)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff Victor Keeylan shall have through August 19, 2019 to pay the $400.00 filing fee or demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so. If he seeks leave to proceed in forma pauperis, his motion must include a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the six-month period preceding the filing of his complaint on July 9, 2019. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/18/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS/STATE OF INDIANA, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT., METRO DRUG TASK FORCE, GARY RIGGS, ANDRE STRONG, filed by VICTOR KEEYLEN. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEEYLEN v. RIGGS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE STRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS/STATE OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY RIGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METRO DRUG TASK FORCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR KEEYLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?