PROFFITT v. JACKSON et al
Plaintiff: DAVID PROFFITT
Defendant: PAUL JACKSON, INDIANA CORRECTIONAL INDUSTRIES and WENDY KNIGHT
Case Number: 1:2019cv02906
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant Name, filed by Plaintiff DAVID PROFFITT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECEIPT #IP066324 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $15.07, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is GRANTED to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Fifteen Dollars and Seven Cents ($15.07). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through August 19, 2019, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. After the initial partial filing fee is received, the Court will screen the complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/23/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, DAVID PROFFITT. (Attachments: #1 Transaction History Inquiry reports)(DJH)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDIANA CORRECTIONAL INDUSTRIES, PAUL JACKSON, and WENDY KNIGHT, filed by DAVID PROFFITT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROFFITT v. JACKSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA CORRECTIONAL INDUSTRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID PROFFITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?