LAB VERDICT, INC. et al v. LAB EQUIP LTD. et al
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE JOHNSON and LAB VERDICT, INC.
Defendant: LAB EQUIP LTD. and MARK RAFMAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv02947
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs LAWRENCE JOHNSON, LAB VERDICT, INC. . (Blanck, Clinton)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Arceneaux, Adam)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Plaintiffs LAWRENCE JOHNSON, LAB VERDICT, INC.. (Blanck, Clinton)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Notice of Removal, re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiffs LAWRENCE JOHNSON, LAB VERDICT, INC.. (Blanck, Clinton)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Arceneaux, Adam)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Arceneaux, Adam)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Defendant removed this action to this Court on July 17, 2019, alleging that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this case. Dkt. 1 at 1. Local Rule 81-1(b) provides: Within 30 days after the filing of the notice of removal, every plaintiff who has not filed a motion to remand must file a statement responding to the notice of removal's allegations as to the citizenship of the parties and the amount in controversy. If the plaintiff lacks sufficient information upon which to form a belief about those allegations despite meeting and conferring in good faith with the removing party about them, the plaintiff may so state. More than 30 days have passed since the filing of the notice of removal, yet Plaintiffs have not moved to remand or filed a response. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by September 10, 2019. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/19/2019.(JDH)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter is currently set for telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference on Monday, September 23, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. The Court, sua sponte, hereby changes the time to 3:30 p.m. (Eastern) on that same date. All other requirements set forth the Court's Scheduling Order dated July 18, 2019 [Dkt. 8] remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/23/2019.(SWM)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendants' #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 8/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/23/2019. (SWM)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 11:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The parties shall file a CMP no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/18/2019.(CBU)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 21, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arceneaux, Adam)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE (Certificate of Compliance with Notice of Removal Procedures), filed by Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN (Arceneaux, Adam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LAB EQUIP LTD.. (Arceneaux, Adam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Hanauer Pittman on behalf of Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Pittman, Alexandria)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Arceneaux on behalf of Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Arceneaux, Adam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D06-1905-PL-021807, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5532882) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Demand, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record (Appearance, Complaint and Exhibits, Summonses, Appearance, Notice of Automatic Enlargement of Time, Docket), #3 Exhibit C - Operative Complaint with Exhibits, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet)(Arceneaux, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAB VERDICT, INC. et al v. LAB EQUIP LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE JOHNSON
Represented By: Clinton E. Blanck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAB VERDICT, INC.
Represented By: Clinton E. Blanck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAB EQUIP LTD.
Represented By: Adam Arceneaux
Represented By: Alexandria Hanauer Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK RAFMAN
Represented By: Adam Arceneaux
Represented By: Alexandria Hanauer Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?