THOMPSON v. TOWN OF NASHVILLE, INDIANA et al
Plaintiff: ADAM THOMPSON
Defendant: BROWN COUNTY, INDIANA and Town of Nashville, Indiana
Case Number: 1:2019cv02958
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk of the Brown County Court acknowledges receipt of remand documents on 9/9/20119 re #10 Transfer Letter to the Clerk of the Brown County Court. Copies of case documents and docket enclosed. (JDC) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JDC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Transfer Letter to the Clerk of the Brown County Court. Copies of case documents and docket enclosed. (JDC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 CLOSED DISMISSED/REMANDED - Plaintiff filed this action in the Brown Circuit Court, alleging false arrest and that his civil rights were violated. The complaint does not specifically plead a cause of action under 42 U.S.C. 1983 or cite to the United States Constitution or other federal law, but its allegations suggested federal question jurisdiction. So, Defendants filed a Notice of Removal, removing this action to this district court. Thereafter, Plaintiff and Defendants filed a Stipulation, stating that the complaint does not expressly set forth a claim based on federal law, a federal question, or a claim within the original jurisdiction of the Court, and that Plaintiff did not intend to raise a federal question or assert a federal cause of action, including a claim under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Based on the parties' stipulation, this action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and remanded to the Brown Circuit Court. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 8/7/2019. (JDC)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION That No Federal Claim is Stated by Complaint, filed by Defendants BROWN COUNTY, INDIANA, TOWN OF NASHVILLE, INDIANA. (Stephenson, James)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Stipulation to Withdraw Federal Claims by BROWN COUNTY, INDIANA, TOWN OF NASHVILLE, INDIANA (Stephenson, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Holloway on behalf of Defendants BROWN COUNTY, INDIANA, Town of Nashville, Indiana. (Holloway, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants BROWN COUNTY, INDIANA, Town of Nashville, Indiana. (Stephenson, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Stephenson on behalf of Defendants BROWN COUNTY, INDIANA, Town of Nashville, Indiana. (Stephenson, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brown Circuit Court, case number 07C01-1906-CT-259, filed by BROWN COUNTY, INDIANA, Town of Nashville, Indiana. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5533613) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint with motion for jury trial, Order, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Jury Demand, Appearance (James S. Stephenson), Appearance (Dan Patterson for plaintiff), Summons, Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMPSON v. TOWN OF NASHVILLE, INDIANA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN COUNTY, INDIANA
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Represented By: Mark A. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Nashville, Indiana
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Represented By: Mark A. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM THOMPSON
Represented By: Dan Arthur Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?