JONES v. ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Plaintiff: KAITLYN JONES
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03018
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLOSED DISMISSED - ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL - The parties having so stipulated, IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action is dismissed, with prejudice, each side bearing its own costs #14 . Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/3/2019.(JDH)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal , filed by Plaintiff KAITLYN JONES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal)(Foushee, Nathan)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - On July 19, 2019, Ms. Jones filed a Complaint against Erie Insurance Exchange ("Erie") alleging that this Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter because "Erie is a Pennsylvania company with a principal business address [in]... Pennsylvania," and Ms. Jones "is a citizen of the State of Indiana." [Filing No. 1 at 2.] On July 30, 2019, the Court entered an Order noting that although Ms. Jones alleged that Erie was a Pennsylvania company with its principal place of business in Pennsylvania--factors that are considered when determining the citizenship of corporations--it did not appear that Erie was an incorporated entity. For these reasons, the Court ORDERS Ms. Jones to file a Second Amended Complaint by September 3, 2019, that addresses the issue outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. If Ms. Jones fails to file a Second Amended Complaint by September 3, 2019, or if her Second Amended Complaint does not cure the jurisdictional issue outlined in this Order, the Court will dismiss the action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/20/2019. (JDC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KAITLYN JONES. ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE served on 7/20/2019. (Foushee, Nathan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Schmitt, Elizabeth)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Dimmitt, Lauren)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Dimmitt on behalf of Defendant ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Dimmitt, Lauren)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Schmitt on behalf of Defendant ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Schmitt, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Foushee, Nathan)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before August 16, 2019 which identifies whether Defendant is an incorporated or other business entity and alleges, if appropriate, the identity and citizenship of its stakeholders. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/30/2019.(JDH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (REO)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D. Foushee on behalf of Plaintiff KAITLYN JONES. (Foushee, Nathan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, filed by KAITLYN JONES. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5537967) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Exhibit A - Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Insurance Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Insurance Policy Declarations, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Foushee, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAITLYN JONES
Represented By: Nathan D. Foushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Represented By: Lauren E. Dimmitt
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?