F.F.T., LLC v. SEXTON, PH.D. et al
Plaintiff: F.F.T., LLC
Defendant: THOMAS SEXTON, PH.D., FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., ASTRID VAN DAM, THOMAS SEXTON and FFT PARTNERS, LLC
Interested Party: KELLIE ARMEY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03027
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER ON MOTION TO SEAL - The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's motion, as well as the redacted version of Mr. Sponsel's report [Dkt. #203 -1] and finds that the information redacted from Docket No. 203-1 is properly withheld from public view. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion to seal [Dkt. #186 ] is GRANTED and the Clerk is directed to maintain Docket No. 185 UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/28/2021. (SWM)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Statement of Filing Public Version of DE 185 pursuant to DE 202 by F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robertson, Christian)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Hearing held on 5/6/2021 re #186 Plaintiff's motion to seal. On or before 5/14/2021, Plaintiff shall file public version of Docket No. #185 from which only information that may properly be sealed has been redacted. Plaintiff's motion to seal #186 remains under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER denying Defendants' #194 Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to UNSEAL Docket Nos. 192, 192-1, and 192-2. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-11(g), documents ordered unsealed by this order shall be unsealed after 21 days absent a Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) objection, a motion to reconsider, an appeal, or further court order. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/3/2021. (SWM)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's motion to seal. [Dkt. #186 .] That motion is scheduled for a telephonic hearing on Thursday, May 6, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the hearing by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/3/2021.(SWM)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 REPLY in Support of Motion re #189 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony from Phillipe B. Cunningham , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 REPLY in Support of Motion re #187 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony from Douglas Kopp and Dr. Michael Robbins , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Newbill, Colleen)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 REPLY in Support of Motion re #184 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Thomas Sponsel's Opinions and Related Testimony , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Robertson, Christian)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony from Phillipe B. Cunningham , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Robertson, Christian)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Unopposed MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #192 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Allen, David)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #187 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony from Douglas Kopp and Dr. Michael Robbins , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Robertson, Christian)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SEALED Exhibits 1 and 3, re #191 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3)(Allen, David)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 RESPONSE in Opposition re #184 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Thomas Sponsel's Opinions and Related Testimony , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4)(Allen, David)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #189 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony from Phillipe B. Cunningham , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Allen, David)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony from Phillipe B. Cunningham, filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #187 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony from Douglas Kopp and Dr. Michael Robbins , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Allen, David)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony from Douglas Kopp and Dr. Michael Robbins, filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #185 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Thomas Sponsel's Rule 26(a)(2) Report Dated October 2, 2020, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, Christian)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 *** SEALED PER DKT. NUMBER #204 *** SEALED Thomas Sponsel's Rule 26(a)(2) Report Dated October 2, 2020, re #184 Motion in Limine, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Robertson, Christian) Modified on 6/2/2021 (SWM).
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Thomas Sponsel's Opinions and Related Testimony, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, Christian)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Complete Deposition of Thomas Sponsel After the Close of Discovery. [Dkt. #181 .] The Court, being duly advised, and noting Defendants' Response to and Joinder in Plaintiff's Motion [Dkt. #182 ], hereby GRANTS the motion. Plaintiff is permitted to complete the deposition of Thomas Sponsel after the March 12, 2021 discovery deadline, so long as Mr. Sponsel's deposition is completed by no later than March 24, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/18/2021. (SWM)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 RESPONSE to Motion re #181 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 24, 2021 in which to #176 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileScheduling to Complete Deposition of Thomas Sponsel , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 24, 2021 in which to #176 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileScheduling to Complete Deposition of Thomas Sponsel, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, Christian)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Answer in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Answer) (JRB)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaims, filed by Counter Defendant F.F.T., LLC. (Robertson, Christian)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Banta, Holiday)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER denying as moot #88 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/12/2021. (JRB)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Defendants' Motion to Modify Case Management Plan. [Dkt. #174 .] When the Court last enlarged the case management deadlines on August 24, 2020, it advised the parties that "No further enlargement of these deadlines will be granted." [Dkt. #121 ] at 3 (emphasis in original).] Accordingly, Defendants' motion is DENIED. However, the Court sua sponte amends the approved Case Management Plan as amended [Dkts. #30 , #91 , #116 , & #121 ] as follows (see Order for established deadlines). The case management deadlines will not be further enlarged for any reason. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/27/2021.(SWM)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 9, 2021 to Complete All Remaining Discovery, filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Allen, David)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 1/14/2021. Settlement was not achieved. Conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Banta, Holiday)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/22/2020. Parties discussed status of discovery & readiness for upcoming settlement conference. Unless parties have agreed to relief requested, Plaintiff will file any motion to enlarge number of depositions to allow Plaintiff to depose Defendants' damages expert on or before December 23, 2020; Defendants shall file any response thereto on or before December 28, 2020, and Plaintiff will file any reply in support of motion on or before December 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Banta, Holiday)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 REPLY in Support of Motion re #153 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 6 - Van Dam Tr. Excerpt)(Tragesser, Joel)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REPLY in Support of Motion re #158 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant FFT PARTNERS, LLC. (Tragesser, Joel)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 REPLY in Support of Motion re #156 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 43 - Excerpts from Functional Family Therapy by Alexander & Parsons (1982), #2 Appendix 44 - Second Office Action for US App. 86051188, #3 Appendix 45 - TSDR for US App. 78021686)(Tragesser, Joel)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #164 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Jenna M. Shives withdrawn and terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/14/2020. (CBU)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Jenna M. Shives, filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM, Counter Claimants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shives, Jenna)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ENTRY denying Plaintiff's #144 Motion to Maintain Document Under Seal. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-11(g), documents ordered unsealed by this order shall be unsealed after 21 days absent a Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) objection, a motion to reconsider, an appeal, or further court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/10/2020. (SWM)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REPLY in Support of Motion re #141 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment & Response on Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix, #2 Exhibit App. 49, #3 Exhibit App. 50, #4 Exhibit App. 51, #5 Exhibit App. 52, #6 Exhibit App. 53, #7 Exhibit App. 54, #8 Exhibit App. 56, #9 Exhibit App. 57, #10 Exhibit App. 58, #11 Exhibit App. 59, #12 Exhibit App. 61, #13 Exhibit App. 62)(Banta, Holiday)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Witness List , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM, Counter Claimants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM, Exhibit List , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM, Counter Claimants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Witness List , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC, Exhibit List , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Banta, Holiday)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Banta, Holiday)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #158 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant FFT PARTNERS, LLC. (Shives, Jenna)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant FFT PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit App 1 - FFT Partners Hayes 30(b)(6) Tr. Excerpts, #2 Exhibit App 2 - FFT065714, #3 Exhibit App 3 - O'Hara Tr. Excerpts, #4 Exhibit App 4 - Benson Tr. Excerpts, #5 Exhibit App 5 - FFT Partners Sexton 30(b)(6) Tr. Excerpts, #6 Exhibit App 6 - FFT104968, #7 Appendix Index of Appendices)(Shives, Jenna)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #156 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON. (Shives, Jenna)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit App 1 - FFTA Sexton 30(b)(6) Tr. Excerpts, #2 Exhibit App 2 - Def. Dep. Ex. 41, #3 Exhibit App 3 - Rowlands Tr. Excerpts, #4 Exhibit App 4 - Def. Dep. Ex. 7, #5 Exhibit App 5 - Def. Dep. Ex. 10, #6 Exhibit App 6 - Sexton Declaration, #7 Exhibit App 7 - Def. Dep. Ex. 44, #8 Exhibit App 8 - Def. Dep. Ex. 19, #9 Exhibit App 9 - Def. Dep. Ex. 47, #10 Exhibit App 10 - 3/14/2012 email chain, #11 Exhibit App 11 - Def. Dep. Ex. 21, #12 Exhibit App 12 - Def. Dep. Ex. 20, #13 Exhibit App 13 - Letter dated 9/25/2012, #14 Exhibit App 14 - Def. Dep. Ex. 31, #15 Exhibit App 15 - Def. Dep. Ex. 63, #16 Exhibit App 16 - Def. Dep. Ex. 23, #17 Exhibit App 17 - INC_00205566-205577, #18 Exhibit App 18 - INC_00058289, #19 Exhibit App 19 - Excerpts from various psychology reference manuals, #20 Exhibit App 20 - INC_00204894-204900, #21 Exhibit App 21 - FFT026909-26919, #22 Exhibit App 22 - Armey Tr. Excerpts, #23 Exhibit App 23 - Def. Dep. Ex. 68, #24 Exhibit App 24 - FFT018472-18631, #25 Exhibit App 25 - Kopp Tr. Excerpts, #26 Exhibit App 26 - Def. Dep. Ex. 69, #27 Exhibit App 27 - Def. Dep. Ex. 48, #28 Exhibit App 28 - Def. Dep. Ex. 61, #29 Exhibit App 29 - FFT LLC Kopp 30(b)(6) Tr. Excerpts, #30 Exhibit App 30 - Def. Dep. Ex. 62, #31 Exhibit App 31 - Def. Dep. Ex. 33, #32 Exhibit App 32 - Def. Dep. Ex. 8, #33 Exhibit App 33 - METZLER00002622-2670, #34 Exhibit App 34 - Def. Dep. Ex. 24, #35 Exhibit App 35 - Def. Dep. Ex. 25, #36 Exhibit App 36 - Def. Dep. Ex. 26, #37 Exhibit App 37 - 10/19/2018 email, #38 Exhibit App 38 - Sexton Tr. Excerpts, #39 Exhibit App 39 - 4/27/2012 email chain, #40 Exhibit App 40 - INC_00001255, #41 Exhibit App 41 - Def. Dep. Ex. 70, #42 Exhibit App 42 - FFT LLC's Answers to Sexton's First Interrogatories, #43 Appendix Index of Appendices)(Shives, Jenna)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on several motions filed by Defendants. The Court, being duly advised, GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Incorrectly Filed Document: Docket No. 150. [Dkt. #151 .] The Clerk is directed to show Docket No. 150 as WITHDRAWN. Defendants' corrected Motion for Leave to File Oversize Brief [Dkt. #152 ] is GRANTED. The page limit for Defendants' combined cross-motion for summary judgment and response to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is enlarged to 55 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/6/2020. (SWM)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #153 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant ASTRID VAN DAM. (Shives, Jenna)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit App 1 - Van Dam Tr. Excerpts, #3 Exhibit App 2 - FFTA 30(b)(6) Tr. Excerpts, #4 Exhibit App 3 - Partners 30(b)(6) Tr. Excerpts, #5 Exhibit App 4 - P. Dep. Ex. 58, #6 Exhibit App 5 - Rowlands Tr. Excerpts)(Shives, Jenna)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shives, Jenna)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION to Withdraw #150 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shives, Jenna)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 *** WITHDRAWN PER DKT. NUMBER #155 *** MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shives, Jenna) Modified on 11/6/2020 (SWM).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Banta, Holiday)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motions to Quash Subpoenas, filed by Interested Party KELLIE ARMEY, re 140 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #139 Submission. (Banta, Holiday)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on #145 Plaintiff's Rule 6(b)(1)(B) Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court has considered #146 Defendants' brief in opposition to the motion and finds it to be entirely without merit. Accordingly, the Court hereby GRANTS hereby GRANTS #145 Plaintiff's motion. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and the related materials are deemed timely filed on October 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/14/2020. (GD)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION for Extension of Time to Deem Plaintiff's MPSJ and Related Documents Timely Filed , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for Extension of Time to Deem Plaintiff's MPSJ and Related Documents Timely Filed, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Banta, Holiday)
October 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #142 SEALED Reply in support of Motion , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banta, Holiday)
October 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #141 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Redacted, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 App. 3, #3 App. 4, #4 App. 5, #5 App. 6, #6 App. 7, #7 App. 8, #8 App. 15, #9 App. 16, #10 App. 17, #11 App. 20, #12 App. 21, #13 App. 22, #14 App. 24, #15 App. 26, #16 App. 28, #17 App. 29, #18 App. 31, #19 App. 32, #20 App. 34, #21 App. 35, #22 App. 36, #23 App. 37, #24 App. 38, #25 App. 39, #26 App. 40)(Banta, Holiday)
October 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 *** CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNSEALED PER DKT. NUMBER #165 *** SEALED REPLY in support of Motion re #141 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 App. 14, #3 App. 18, #4 App. 19, #5 App. 23, #6 App. 25, #7 App. 27, #8 App. 41, #9 App. 42, #10 App. 43, #11 App. 44, #12 App. 45, #13 App. 46, #14 App. 47, #15 App. 48)(Banta, Holiday) Modified on 3/11/2021 (SWM).
October 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Banta, Holiday)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Case transferred in from District of Northern District of Ohio; Case Number 3:20-mc-86-JGC. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received at 139.(JRB)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Submission of Records Received from the Northern District of Ohio re: 3:20-mc-86-JGC, filed by Interested Party KELLIE ARMEY. (Attachments: #1 First Motion to Quash Subpoena, #2 Second Motion to Quash Subpoena, #3 Motion to Transfer)(JRB)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Robertson, Christian)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting Defendants' #133 Motion for Leave to Conduct the Deposition of Dr. James Alexander Beyond the Close of Discovery. Defendants are permitted to take the deposition of Dr. Alexander as soon as his medical emergency has resolved sufficiently to permit it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/25/2020. (SWM)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Statement of Claims and Defenses by F.F.T., LLC. (Robertson, Christian)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Statement of Claims and Defenses by FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re #133 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Deposition of Dr. James Alexander Beyond the Close of Discovery , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Robertson, Christian)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Deposition of Dr. James Alexander Beyond the Close of Discovery, filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Allen, David)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Witness List Second Supplemental Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC, Exhibit List Second Supplemental Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Robertson, Christian)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Ziepolt on behalf of Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM, Counter Claimants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Ziepolt, Patrick)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #126 Motion for Extension of Time to Modify Case Management Plan. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/21/2020.. (SWM)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPLY in Support of Motion re #126 MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 days of Certain Case Management Deadlines (CORRECTED), filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9.17.20 Motion to Quash, #2 Exhibit 9.18.20 Motion to Quash, #3 Exhibit 9.18.20 Motion to Compel)(Robertson, Christian)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 REPLY in Support of Motion re #126 MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 days of Certain Case Management Deadlines , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9.17.20 Motion to Quash, #2 Exhibit 9.18.20 Motion to Quash, #3 Exhibit 9.18.20 Motion to Compel)(Robertson, Christian)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re #126 MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 days of Certain Case Management Deadlines , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 days of Certain Case Management Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, Christian)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/2/2020. Parties discussed status of discovery. Defendants are authorized to file motion to compel Plaintiff to provide more complete response to request for admission regarding use of videos produced by Plaintiff, if parties cannot resolve their dispute with guidance provided by Court. Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 10/1/2020 is CONTINUED to 1/14/2021 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time). Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/22/2020 at 2:30 PM (Eastern Time) to discuss parties' readiness for settlement conference & parties' Supplemental Joint Reports on Status of Discovery due 9/28/2020, 10/26/2020, 11/23/2020, & 12/21/2020. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD) Modified on 12/21/2020 (GD).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Robertson, Christian)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (TIME ONLY): This matter is currently set for a Telephonic Status Conference on 9/2/2020 at 11:00 AM. The Court, sua sponte, hereby changes the time to 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) on that same date. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/27/2020. (GD)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the parties' #120 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Plan. The parties' motion disregards the 10/9/2020 dispositive motions deadline, prior to which date the parties must complete liability discovery and file their statement of claims or defenses. Nevertheless, the Court GRANTS IN PART & DENIES IN PART the motion. The approved Case Management Plan as amended ( #30 , #91 , & #116 ) is hereby further amended. Statement of Claims or Defenses due by 9/25/2020. Discovery due by 9/24/2020. No further enlargements of these deadlines will be granted. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/24/2020. (GD) Modified on 8/26/2020 (GD).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 days of Certain Case Management Deadlines, filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Modify Case Management Plan)(Shives, Jenna)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: Parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference #118 is hereby GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART. Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 8/14/2020 is CONTINUED to 10/1/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time). Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) to discuss parties' next Supplemental Joint Discovery Status Report due 8/31/2020. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/11/2020. (GD) (Main Document 119 replaced on 8/27/2020) (GD).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Joint MOTION to Vacate Settlement Conference, filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shives, Jenna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Robertson, Christian)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #114 Motion for Extension of Time to serve expert witness disclosures and reports (See Order). No further enlargements of these deadlines is anticipated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/30/2020. (CBU)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Submission of Proposed Order , re #114 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Damages Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Robertson, Christian)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Damages Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Robertson, Christian)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/8/2020. Parties discussed status of discovery & readiness for upcoming settlement conference. Conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Robertson, Christian)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - This matter is currently set for an in-person Settlement Conference on Friday, August 14, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. (Eastern). The Court, sua sponte, hereby CONVERTS the settlement conference from in person to telephonic; all other requirements of the Court's Orders scheduling the settlement conference [Dkts. #28 , #69 , & #82 ] remain in effect, and all persons required to appear thereby shall appear by telephone for the settlement conference via call-in information to be separately provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/26/2020.(SWM)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #100 Motion to Compel. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, each Defendant shall, with regard to Requests 33 and 96, (1) complete its search of all reasonably likely sources of responsive documents within that Defendant's possession, custody, or control; (2) produce all non-privileged responsive documents; and (3) produce a privilege log that identifies any documents responsive to those requests that were withheld on privilege grounds. In addition, Defendants shall produce unredacted versions of the documents they have produced in redacted form within 14 days of the date of this Order. Because this motion has been granted in part and denied in part, both parties' request for attorney fees is DENIED. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/15/2020. (SWM)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/10/2020. Parties discussed status of discovery. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/8/2020 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time) to discuss parties' next Supplemental Joint Report on Status of Discovery due 7/6/2020. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery, filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM (Shives, Jenna)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Robertson, Christian)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REPLY in Support of Motion re #100 MOTION to Compel Discovery , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Robertson, Christian)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #100 MOTION to Compel Discovery , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Allen, David)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. [Dkt. 100.] Any response to the Motion is due on or before June 2, 2020. Any reply in support of the Motion is due on or before June 5, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/27/2020.(SWM)
May 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #100 MOTION to Compel Discovery , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit)(Robertson, Christian)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION to Compel Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Robertson, Christian)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/14/2020. Parties discussed status of discovery. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/10/2020 at 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) to discuss parties' next Supplemental Joint Report on Status of Discovery due 6/8/2020. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY in Support of Motion re #88 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Tortious Interference with Business Relationships (Count II) , filed by Counter Defendant F.F.T., LLC. (Robertson, Christian)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Robertson, Christian)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Tortious Interference with Business Relationships (Count II) , filed by Counter Claimants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON. (Allen, David)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of the Parties' Agreement to an Extension of Time to File Motions to Compel, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC (Robertson, Christian)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 4/28/2020. Parties discussed a number of discovery disputes. If necessary following guidance provided, Plaintiff is authorized to file motion to compel Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's request for production nos. 1 through 98. In addition, Court hereby modifies approved confidentiality Protective Order as amended [Dkts. #68 & #75 ]. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 11:30 AM (Eastern Time). *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Parties' #87 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The approved Case Management Plan [Dkt. 30] is hereby amended as follows (see Order for established deadlines). No further enlargement of these deadlines is anticipated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/20/2020.(SWM)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/15/2020. Parties discussed status of discovery. Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 4/28/2020 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time). The purpose of the conference is to address all pending discovery disputes between the parties. The parties are ordered to meet-and-confer, as required by Local Rule 37-1(a), with regard to all pending discovery disputes by no later than 4/24/2020. On or before 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) on 4/27/2020, the parties are to email the Court at MJDinsmore@insd.uscourts.gov, with a copy to each other: (1) a brief outline of each remaining discovery dispute, (2) their respective positions on each such issue(s), (3) copies of all discovery requests and responses at issue (if any), and (4) any other documents they would like the Court to review in advance of the conference. If, after conducting a proper meet-and-confer the parties are able to resolve all pending disputes, then by no later than 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) on 4/27/2020, the parties shall email the Court at MJDinsmore@insd.uscourts.gov to request that the discovery conference be vacated. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #88 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Tortious Interference with Business Relationships (Count II) , filed by Counter Defendant F.F.T., LLC. (Robertson, Christian)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Tortious Interference with Business Relationships (Count II), filed by Counter Defendant F.F.T., LLC. (Robertson, Christian)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, Christian)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Robertson, Christian)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Answer in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Answer) (JRB)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint [D.E. 36], COUNTERCLAIM by SEXTON, INC, and PARTNERS against F.F.T., LLC, filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allen, David)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/11/2020. Parties discussed status of discovery. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 8/14/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time). Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/15/2020 at 5:00 PM (Eastern Time) to discuss parties' next Supplemental Joint Report on Status of Discovery now due 4/13/2020. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING #72 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Defendants Motion for Partial Dismissal and to Strike Irrelevant Exhibits to Amended Complaint #42 is hereby DENIED. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/11/2020.(JRB)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Robertson, Christian)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel E. Tragesser on behalf of Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Tragesser, Joel)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Rae Downham on behalf of Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Downham, Jordan)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna M. Shives on behalf of Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Shives, Jenna)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER AMENDING #74 APPROVED PROTECTIVE ORDER. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/21/2020. (SWM)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, David)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and III of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike #5 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #36 Amended Complaint Exhibits J and K filed by FFT PARTNERS, LLC, THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM and FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/14/2020.(SWM)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/12/2020. Parties discussed status of discovery. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 1:30 PM (Eastern Time) to discuss parties' next Supplemental Joint Report on Status of Discovery due 3/9/2020. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Robertson, Christian)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court, sua sponte, hereby CONTINUES the Settlement Conference currently scheduled for March 24, 2020 to Monday, March 30, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. (Eastern), in Room 257, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. All other requirements of the Court's Order scheduling the settlement conference [Dkt. 28] remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/27/2020.(SWM)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ENTRY REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE - The Honorable Mark J. Dinsmore, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 to conduct and issue a report and recommendation regarding Defendants Motion #42 to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/17/2020.(JRB)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 UNIFORM STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #63 Approved as Amended and Entered as an Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/16/2020.(SWM)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/15/2020. Parties discussed status of discovery. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 2:30 PM (Eastern Time) to discuss parties' next Supplemental Joint Report on Status of Discovery due 2/10/2020. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DISCOVERY Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC.(Banta, Holiday)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Protective Order)(Robertson, Christian)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Defendant FFT PARTNERS, LLC, Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Defendant FFT PARTNERS, LLC. (Allen, David)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Christian H. Robertson for F.F.T., LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/20/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/19/2019. Parties discussed status of discovery. Defendant FFT Partners, LLC shall file its preliminary witness & exhibit lists on or before December 27, 2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 10:45 AM (Eastern Time) to discuss parties' NEXT Supplemental Joint Report on Status of Discovery due 1/13/2020. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christian H. Robertson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP67714), filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) no env(CKM)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #56 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Megan Danielle Hedrick withdrawn as counsel for the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/18/2019. (CBU)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Megan D. Hedrick, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Megan D. Hedrick)(Hedrick, Megan)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STATUS REPORT Supplemental Joint Report on the Status of Discovery by F.F.T., LLC. (Banta, Holiday)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendant FFT PARTNERS, LLC. (Allen, David)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY in Support of Motion re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and III of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike #5 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #36 Amended Complaint Exhibits J and K , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/20/2019. Parties discussed status of discovery. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 3:15 PM (Eastern Time) to discuss case status & parties' Supplemental Joint Report on Status of Discovery due 12/16/2019. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures Supplemental, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Banta, Holiday)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Exhibit List Supplemental Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC, Witness List Supplemental Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Banta, Holiday)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPORT Joint Report on the Status of Discovery by F.F.T., LLC. (Banta, Holiday)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #23 MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL AND TO STRIKE IRRELEVANT EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/18/2019. (JRB)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and III of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike #5 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #36 Amended Complaint Exhibits J and K , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (LeVere, T.)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FFT PARTNERS, LLC. (Allen, David)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Newbill on behalf of Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Newbill, Colleen)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and III of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike #5 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #36 Amended Complaint Exhibits J and K , filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and III of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (), MOTION to Strike #5 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #36 Amended Complaint Exhibits J and K (), filed by Defendants FFT PARTNERS, LLC, FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Allen on behalf of Defendant FFT PARTNERS, LLC. (Allen, David)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Garry Lee Founds on behalf of Defendant FFT PARTNERS, LLC. (Founds, Garry)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Erick Thomas Gjerdingen on behalf of Defendant FFT PARTNERS, LLC. (Gjerdingen, Erick)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Amended Complaint in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (JRB)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Witness List Preliminary Witness and Exhibit List, filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against F.F.T., LLC, filed by F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DD-Pages from Australian Association of Family Therapy website, #2 Exhibit EE-Webpages from Cayuga Centers' website, #3 Exhibit FF-Defendant Sexton's LinkedIn profile)(Banta, Holiday)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Preliminary Witness and Exhibit List filed by F.F.T., LLC (Banta, Holiday) Modified on 10/7/2019 (JRB).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 10/11/2019 re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike Irrelevant Exhibits to Complaint. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2019. (SWM)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to October 11, 2019 re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike Irrelevant Exhibits to Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Amend the Complaint as of Right, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting F.F.T.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion)(Banta, Holiday)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Gjerdingen, Erick)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER withdrawing #6 Motion to Maintain Document Under Seal and to UNSEAL Docket Nos 5 and 5-1 through 5-30. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/23/2019. (CBU)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2020. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/19/2019. (GD)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: In order to assist the Court in more effectively managing discovery in this matter, on or before November 18, 2019, the parties shall jointly file a "Joint Report on the Status of Discovery". *SEE ORDER FOR REQUIREMENTS.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/19/2019. (GD)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/19/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 4:30 PM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Regarding Protective Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/19/2019.(CBU)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC . (Banta, Holiday)
September 11, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike Irrelevant Exhibits to Complaint , filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike Irrelevant Exhibits to Complaint, filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2019 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/14/2019.(SWM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #5 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Complaint and Exhibit N , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Banta, Holiday)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Garry Lee Founds on behalf of Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Founds, Garry)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #5 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Complaint and Exhibit N , filed by Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Allen, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Erick Thomas Gjerdingen on behalf of Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Gjerdingen, Erick)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Allen on behalf of Defendants FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (Allen, David)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney T. Earl LeVere for F.F.T., LLC added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, T. Earl LeVere is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to T. Earl LeVere via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/5/2019. (SWM)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Sealed Complaint, Motion to Maintain Document Under Seal, Brief in Support of Motion to Maintain Document Under Seal, E-Filing Appearance by Attorney Banta in Civil Case, E-Filing Appearance by Attorney Hedrick in Civil Case, and Corporate Disclosure Statement for Plaintiff F.F.T. LLC served on Defendants Sexton, Functional Family Therapy Associates, Inc., and Van Dam on July 24, 2019, filed by F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service with Ex. 1 Certified Mail receipts and Ex. 2 USPS Proofs of Signature)(Banta, Holiday)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) T. Earl LeVere to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number IP066002), filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SWM)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB) Modified on 7/23/2019 (JRB).
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by F.F.T., LLC. (Banta, Holiday)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Danielle Hedrick on behalf of Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Hedrick, Megan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Holiday W. Banta on behalf of Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Banta, Holiday)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 First MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #5 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Complaint and Exhibit N , filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Banta, Holiday)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #5 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Complaint and Exhibit N, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Complaint and Exhibit, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 1 of 13, #3 Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 13, #4 Exhibit 1, Part 3 of 13, #5 Exhibit 1, Part 4 of 13, #6 Exhibit 1, Part 5 of 13, #7 Exhibit 1, Part 6 of 13, #8 Exhibit 1, Part 7 of 13, #9 Exhibit 1, Part 8 of 13, #10 Exhibit 1, Part 9 of 13, #11 Exhibit 1, Part 10 of 13, #12 Exhibit 1, Part 11 of 13, #13 Exhibit 1, Part 12 of 13, #14 Exhibit 1, Part 13 of 13)(Banta, Holiday)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SEALED Complaint, filed by Plaintiff F.F.T., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Blueprints for Healthy Youth Development FFT, #3 Exhibit B - FFT Partner Solicitation Letter- Another option in the FFT world, #4 Exhibit C - Registration Certificate 4389569, #5 Exhibit D - Registration Certificate 4435321, #6 Exhibit E - Registration Certificate 5267897, #7 Exhibit F - 88318043 - Application & TSDR Report, #8 Exhibit G - Functional Family Therapy website, #9 Exhibit H - Our Partners - About FFT Training - Functional Family Therapy, #10 Exhibit I - FFT-CW_ORI_Study, #11 Exhibit J - Certificate_of_Registration_-_#TX_8-663-011_-10_22_18, #12 Exhibit K - Certificate_of_Registration_-_#TX_8-664-527_-10_22_18, #13 Exhibit L - Certificate_of_Registration_-_1_23_19_-_Reg__No__TX_8-696-584, #14 Exhibit M - Sexton Training Protocols, #15 Exhibit N - Sexton signed settlement agreement (UNDER SEAL), #16 Exhibit O - Sexton referencing Alexander in training materials, #17 Exhibit Disclosure of confidential Agreement, #18 Exhibit Q - Sexton allowing Astrid Van Dam to train PDF, #19 Exhibit R - Sexton Claiming himself as developer, #20 Exhibit S - FFT LLC - FFT Partners Analysis11-29-12-2 copy, #21 Exhibit T - Sexton website alleging evidence based, #22 Exhibit U - Sexton Blueprint certified claim, #23 Exhibit V - Turner Blueprints letter, #24 Exhibit W - Sexton Infringing Marks, #25 Exhibit X - 2015 FFT-CW Agreement, #26 Exhibit Y - Aug 14, 2018 K. Collette Letter to NYF, #27 Exhibit Z - FFT-TCM Linkedin, #28 Exhibit AA - New York child welfare leaders call for stronger commitment to evidence, #29 Exhibit BB - FFT-TCM docs combined, #30 Exhibit CC - Email Chain PDF)(Banta, Holiday)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to F.F.T., LLC. (LAB) (JRB)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC., THOMAS SEXTON, ASTRID VAN DAM. (JRB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by F.F.T., LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5538384) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Banta, Holiday)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F.F.T., LLC v. SEXTON, PH.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.F.T., LLC
Represented By: Holiday W. Banta
Represented By: Megan Danielle Hedrick
Represented By: T. Earl LeVere
Represented By: Christian H. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS SEXTON, PH.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUNCTIONAL FAMILY THERAPY ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Garry Lee Founds
Represented By: Erick Thomas Gjerdingen
Represented By: David Michael Allen
Represented By: Colleen Newbill
Represented By: Jenna M. Shives
Represented By: Joel E. Tragesser
Represented By: Jordan Rae Downham
Represented By: Patrick A. Ziepolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRID VAN DAM
Represented By: Garry Lee Founds
Represented By: Erick Thomas Gjerdingen
Represented By: David Michael Allen
Represented By: Colleen Newbill
Represented By: Jenna M. Shives
Represented By: Joel E. Tragesser
Represented By: Jordan Rae Downham
Represented By: Patrick A. Ziepolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS SEXTON
Represented By: Garry Lee Founds
Represented By: Erick Thomas Gjerdingen
Represented By: David Michael Allen
Represented By: Colleen Newbill
Represented By: Jenna M. Shives
Represented By: Joel E. Tragesser
Represented By: Jordan Rae Downham
Represented By: Patrick A. Ziepolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FFT PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Colleen Newbill
Represented By: David Michael Allen
Represented By: Erick Thomas Gjerdingen
Represented By: Garry Lee Founds
Represented By: Jenna M. Shives
Represented By: Joel E. Tragesser
Represented By: Jordan Rae Downham
Represented By: Patrick A. Ziepolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KELLIE ARMEY
Represented By: T. Earl LeVere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?