BOURDILLON v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC.
Plaintiff: PATRICK BOURDILLON
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03201
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2020. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/26/2019.(SWM)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on September 23, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on December 23, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern Time), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant Indiana University Health Care Associates, Inc.'s Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC..(Martin, Bonnie)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC. . (Martin, Bonnie)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/21/219.(SWM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Martin, Bonnie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Martin, Bonnie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L. Martin on behalf of Defendant INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Martin, Bonnie)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jennifer F. Cohen for PATRICK BOURDILLON added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Jennifer F. Cohen register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by August 26, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of her admission pro hac vice. Copy to Jennifer F. Cohen via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/12/2019. (SWM)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Christopher P. Thorman for PATRICK BOURDILLON added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/12/2019. (SWM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jennifer F. Cohen to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5572015), filed by Plaintiff PATRICK BOURDILLON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Jennifer F. Cohen, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher P. Thorman to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5572000), filed by Plaintiff PATRICK BOURDILLON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Christopher P. Thorman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by PATRICK BOURDILLON. INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 8/2/2019. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC. (JRB)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann DeLaney on behalf of Plaintiff PATRICK BOURDILLON. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC., filed by PATRICK BOURDILLON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5554954) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(DeLaney, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOURDILLON v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Bonnie L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK BOURDILLON
Represented By: Kathleen Ann DeLaney
Represented By: Christopher P. Thorman
Represented By: Jennifer F. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?