HERNANDEZ v. RN STAFF INC. et al

Plaintiff: CZESAR HERNANDEZ
Defendant: Manuel Garcia and RN STAFF INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03203
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JDC)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 6:19-cv-00048. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: granting #16 defendants' motion to transfer case. Pursuant to the recorded telephone conference held on 7/31/2019, and with plaintiff's consent, this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Indiana. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/31/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
July 31, 2019 TEXT Minute Entry for recorded Telephone Conference held on 7/31/2019 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: Court addresses defendants' motion to transfer with the parties. With plaintiff's consent, the court will transfer this case to the Southern District of Indiana. Defendants' motion is granted and the clerk is directed to transfer this case. Further, plaintiff advises he has moved and will be filing a notice of change of address. Appearances: Czesar Hernandez, pro se plaintiff; Steven Williams, Esq. for defendants. (FTR Recorded. Time: 10:01 AM - 10:06 AM) [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference re #16 defendants' Motion to Transfer is set for 7/31/2019 at 10:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The clerk will provide call-in information prior to the conference call. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/16/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Transfer Case 6:19-CV-48 Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Brenda K. Sannes Response to Motion due by 7/15/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. filed by RN Staff Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Employment Agreement) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Williams, Steven) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: granting #14 Letter Request for an extension of time. The time for defendants Manuel Garcia and RN Staff Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 7/12/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/3/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 Letter Motion from Steven W. Williams, Esq. for RN Staff Inc. requesting Extension of time to submit answer submitted to Judge Baxter . (Williams, Steven) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: granting #12 Letter Request for an extension of time. The time for defendants Manuel Garcia and RN Staff Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 7/2/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/10/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Steven Williams for Manuel Garcia requesting Extension of Time submitted to Judge Baxter . (Williams, Steven) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Williams on behalf of All Defendants (Williams, Steven) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: re #9 Letter. Defendants are granted an extension of time, until 6/11/2019, to secure local counsel. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 5/28/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail, with a copy of the #9 letter. Copy served upon Attorney Cento via email] (nmk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Motion from G. John Cento, Esq. requesting an extension of time to find local counsel for defendants submitted to Judge Baxter. (nmk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
May 21, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: On 4/22/2019, plaintiff filed proof of service asserting that the summons and complaint were served upon the defendants on 4/15/2019. The time for defendants to file an answer or otherwise move has expired. Pursuant to Local Rule 55.1, plaintiff may request a clerk's entry of default or, in the alternative, plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 6/21/2019. [Copy served via regular mail upon pro se plaintiff and upon defendants with a copy of the docket sheet and #8 affidavit of service per chambers.] (nmk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
April 23, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Manuel Garcia answer due 5/6/2019; RN Staff Inc. answer due 5/6/2019. (meb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and General Order #25 served on RN Staff Inc. and Manuel Garcia on 4/15/2019, filed by Czesar Hernandez. [Plaintiff sent a second copy of the affidavits separately in an envelope addressed to Judge Baxter. It is being kept with the original.] (Attachments: #1 Mailing envelope)(meb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: In light of #6 plaintiff's letter updating the court on his attempts to serve the defendants, plaintiff's time to serve the summons, complaint, and G.O. 25 filing order upon the defendants is extended 60 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff is directed to file another status report regarding service or proper proof of service by 6/17/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 4/18/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 Letter regarding the #5 Text Order filed by Czesar Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Mailing envelope) [Plaintiff sent a second copy of this letter separately in an envelope addressed to Judge Baxter. It is being kept with the original.](meb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The 60 day time frame within which the Summons, Complaint, and G. O. 25 Filing Order were to be served upon the defendants has expired. Plaintiff is directed to advise the court of the status of this action IN WRITING by 4/8/2019. If service has been completed, proper proof of such service shall be filed. If service has not been completed, plaintiff may submit a written request for an extension of such time. Due to the apparent delay in service the Rule 16 conference set for 4/15/2019 at 10:00 a.m. and related civil case management plan deadline are adjourned without date. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 3/26/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed. (meb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 10:00 AM via telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/8/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) [Sent to pro se plaintiff via regular mail.](meb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RN Staff Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Manuel Garcia) [Original summonses given to plaintiff at the time of filing for service.](meb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Manuel Garcia, RN Staff Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 3BNG2608) filed by Czesar Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ v. RN STAFF INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Garcia
Represented By: STEVEN W. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN STAFF INC
Represented By: STEVEN W. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CZESAR HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?