RANDALL v. STANDARD
Plaintiff: RANDALL M. TODD
Defendant: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03222
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF STIPULATION DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS MOOT - Having come before the Court on the parties' Stipulation Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as Moot, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment #7 is hereby denied as moot #12 . Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/19/2019. (JDH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as Moot, filed by Defendant STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(von Schleicher, Warren)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Liability , filed by Defendant STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (von Schleicher, Warren)
September 15, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent MEIJI YASUDA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY for STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (von Schleicher, Warren)
September 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren von Schleicher on behalf of Defendant STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (von Schleicher, Warren)
September 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY.(von Schleicher, Warren)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Liability, filed by Plaintiff RANDALL M. TODD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saint, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by RANDALL M. TODD. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY served on 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Marjorie Dishon, #2 Exhibit Letter to Highest Ranking Officer, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Summons, #5 Exhibit Appearance, #6 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit FedEx Signed Delivery Document)(Saint, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (DJH)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Saint on behalf of Plaintiff RANDALL M. TODD. (Saint, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by RANDALL M. TODD. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5557215)(Attachments: #1 Exhibit Standard Insurance Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Saint, Robert) Modified on 8/1/2019 - Edited for administrative purposes(NAD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RANDALL v. STANDARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL M. TODD
Represented By: Robert E. Saint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Warren von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?