MILLER v. CONCENTRIX CORPORATION
Plaintiff: CECILIA MILLER
Defendant: CONCENTRIX CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv03326
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CONCENTRIX CORPORATION. (Wilson, Amy)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Suzanne Wilson on behalf of Defendant CONCENTRIX CORPORATION. (Wilson, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Concentrix Corporation on September 5, 2019, filed by CECILIA MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service Affidavit)(Weldy, Ronald)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CONCENTRIX CORPORATION. (JDH)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF PROCESS - The Court, having considered the above action and the matters that are pending, makes the following rulings: 1.Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis, #2 , is granted. 2.This action shall proceed with Title VII and FMLA claims against Concentrix Corporation. 3.The clerk shall endorse and return the summonses tendered by Plaintiff to counsel for Plaintiff. 4.Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for serving process on Defendant unless a further specific request is made that court officers effect service of process. (See Entry). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/30/2019. (JDH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff CECILIA MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Forma Pauperis, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weldy, Ronald)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E. Weldy on behalf of Plaintiff CECILIA MILLER. (Weldy, Ronald)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against CONCENTRIX CORPORATION, filed by CECILIA MILLER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Weldy, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. CONCENTRIX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECILIA MILLER
Represented By: Ronald E. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONCENTRIX CORPORATION
Represented By: Amy Suzanne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?