BARNES v. METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP et al
Plaintiff: AUDREY S BARNES and AUDREY S. BARNES
Defendant: REGINALD MCGREGOR, BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, CAROL HELMUS, METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, WENDY MUSTON, SHAWN SMITH, RICHARD FREIJE, JR. and SHAWN DENNEY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03340
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/7/2019 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/2/2019.(SWM)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiff AUDREY S. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion)(Maddox, Jamie)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2019 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/11/2019.(SWM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY, filed by All Defendants.(Prather, R.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Anthony Prather on behalf of Defendants BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, SHAWN DENNEY, RICHARD FREIJE, JR, CAROL HELMUS, REGINALD MCGREGOR, METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, WENDY MUSTON, SHAWN SMITH. (Prather, R.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Hunter on behalf of Defendants BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, SHAWN DENNEY, RICHARD FREIJE, JR, CAROL HELMUS, REGINALD MCGREGOR, METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, WENDY MUSTON, SHAWN SMITH. (Hunter, Taylor)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to SHAWN DENNEY, RICHARD FREIJE, JR, CAROL HELMUS, REGINALD MCGREGOR, WENDY MUSTON, SHAWN SMITH. (TMB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to SHAWN DENNEY, RICHARD FREIJE, JR, CAROL HELMUS, REGINALD MCGREGOR, WENDY MUSTON, SHAWN SMITH. (Maddox, Jamie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, SHAWN DENNEY, RICHARD FREIJE, JR, CAROL HELMUS, REGINALD MCGREGOR, METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, WENDY MUSTON, SHAWN SMITH. (JRB)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Harrison Holler on behalf of Plaintiff AUDREY S BARNES. (Holler, Chad)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra L. Blevins on behalf of Plaintiff AUDREY S BARNES. (Blevins, Sandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie A. Maddox on behalf of Plaintiff AUDREY S BARNES. (Maddox, Jamie)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, SHAWN DENNEY, RICHARD FREIJE, JR, CAROL HELMUS, REGINALD MCGREGOR, METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, WENDY MUSTON, SHAWN SMITH, filed by AUDREY S BARNES. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5567616) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Maddox, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARNES v. METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGINALD MCGREGOR
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL HELMUS
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY MUSTON
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN SMITH
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD FREIJE, JR.
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN DENNEY
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDREY S BARNES
Represented By: Jamie A. Maddox
Represented By: Chad Harrison Holler
Represented By: Sandra L. Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDREY S. BARNES
Represented By: Jamie A. Maddox
Represented By: Chad Harrison Holler
Represented By: Sandra L. Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?