CLORE v. RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: STACEY CLORE
Defendant: RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03458
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Kersting, Edna)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (LAB) (CKM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Kersting, Edna)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 2:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/17/2019.(CBU)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Kersting, Edna)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edna Sybil Kersting on behalf of Defendant RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Kersting, Edna)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by STACEY CLORE. RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 8/20/2019. (O'Ryan, Bridget)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (AKH)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget L. O'Ryan on behalf of Plaintiff STACEY CLORE. (O'Ryan, Bridget)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by STACEY CLORE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5579407) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(O'Ryan, Bridget)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLORE v. RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY CLORE
Represented By: Bridget L. O'Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Edna Sybil Kersting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?