KEMP v. HILL
Plaintiff: KURT J. KEMP
Defendant: CURTIS HILL
Case Number: 1:2019cv03501
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLOSED JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58 - For the reasons set forth in the Court's Order entered this day, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT and DISMISSES Plaintiff's Complaint WITH PREJUDICE. Copy to Kurt J. Kemp via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/4/2019.(JDH)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Mr. Kemp has also filed a Motion for Appointment of Counsel, [Filing No. 7], and a Motion for Certification as a Class, [Filing No. 8]. Because the case is being dismissed, these motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Court, having considered the above action and the matters that are pending, makes the following rulings: 1. Mr. Kemp's Amended Complaint, #6 , is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 2. Mr. Kemp's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #7 , and Motion for Certification as a Class, #8 , are DENIED AS MOOT. Final judgment shall issue accordingly. (See Order). Copy to Kurt J. Kemp via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/4/2019. (JDH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Certification as a Class, filed by Plaintiff KURT J. KEMP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Plaintiff KURT J. KEMP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(JDH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CURTIS HILL, filed by KURT J. KEMP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - The Court, having considered the above action and the matters that are pending, makes the following rulings: 1. Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis, #2 , is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. #1 Mr. Kemp may file an Amended Complaint that states a legally cognizable claim and demonstrates Mr. Kemp has standing on or before October 15, 2019. The failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action. (See Entry). Copy to Kurt J. Kemp via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/16/2019. (JDH)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff KURT J. KEMP. (Attachments: #1 Table of Authorities, #2 Envelope)(JDH)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, KURT J. KEMP. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Inmate Trust Account, #2 Envelope)(DJH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CURTIS HILL filed by KURT J. KEMP. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEMP v. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KURT J. KEMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTIS HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?