C. v. COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: E.C., BY NEXT FRIENDS MARIO C. AND KIM C. and E. C.
Defendant: COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY, COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF SOUTHERN HANCOCK COUNTY and SAMSON T. LIVINGSTON
Case Number: 1:2019cv03563
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 Amended Defendant Livingston's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against E. C., filed by SAMSON T. LIVINGSTON.(Keyes, Jon)
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 Defendant Livingston's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against E. C., filed by SAMSON T. LIVINGSTON.(Keyes, Jon)
October 14, 2019 Filing 21 DEFENDANT, COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Additional Defenses, filed by COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY.(McCarney, Patrick)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER- Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/20/2019.(CBU)
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant Southern Hancock County Community School Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Additional Defenses, filed by COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF SOUTHERN HANCOCK COUNTY.(Smith, Kevin)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin S. Smith on behalf of Defendant COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF SOUTHERN HANCOCK COUNTY. (Smith, Kevin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant SAMSON T. LIVINGSTON. (Keyes, Jon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY. (McCarney, Patrick)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon A. Keyes on behalf of Defendant SAMSON T. LIVINGSTON. (Keyes, Jon)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Stephen McCarney on behalf of Defendant COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY. (McCarney, Patrick)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryce H. Bennett, Jr on behalf of Defendant COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY. (Bennett, Bryce)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by E. C.. SAMSON T. LIVINGSTON served on 8/27/2019. (Conklin, Annavieve)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by E. C.. COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY served on 8/26/2019. (Conklin, Annavieve)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by E. C.. COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF SOUTHERN HANCOCK COUNTY served on 8/27/2019. (Conklin, Annavieve)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Proceed Under the Pseudonym "E.C., by next friends Mario C. and Kim C." (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/26/2019. (SWM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY, COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF SOUTHERN HANCOCK COUNTY, SAMSON T. LIVINGSTON. (AKH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Annavieve C. Conklin on behalf of Plaintiff E.C., BY NEXT FRIENDS MARIO C. AND KIM C.. (Conklin, Annavieve)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED Plaintiff's Notice of intention to Seek Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym, re #3 Motion (Other), filed by Plaintiff E.C., BY NEXT FRIENDS MARIO C. AND KIM C.. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym, filed by Plaintiff E.C., BY NEXT FRIENDS MARIO C. AND KIM C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann DeLaney on behalf of Plaintiff E.C., BY NEXT FRIENDS MARIO C. AND KIM C.. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY, COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF SOUTHERN HANCOCK COUNTY, SAMSON T. LIVINGSTON, filed by E.C., BY NEXT FRIENDS MARIO C. AND KIM C.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5593071) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(DeLaney, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. v. COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF EASTERN HANCOCK COUNTY
Represented By: Patrick Stephen McCarney
Represented By: Bryce H. Bennett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION OF SOUTHERN HANCOCK COUNTY
Represented By: Kevin S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSON T. LIVINGSTON
Represented By: Jon A. Keyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.C., BY NEXT FRIENDS MARIO C. AND KIM C.
Represented By: Kathleen Ann DeLaney
Represented By: Annavieve C. Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. C.
Represented By: Kathleen Ann DeLaney
Represented By: Annavieve C. Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?