LIPPITZ v. VIRTUOSO SOURCING GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA LIPPITZ
Defendant: VIRTUOSO SOURCING GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03571
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/8/2019.(JRB)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIRTUOSO SOURCING GROUP, LLC. (Bailen, Neal)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by VIRTUOSO SOURCING GROUP, LLC.(Bailen, Neal)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal F. Bailen on behalf of Defendant VIRTUOSO SOURCING GROUP, LLC. (Bailen, Neal)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to , filed by Plaintiff CYNTHIA LIPPITZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Philipps, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Entry of Default, filed by Plaintiff CYNTHIA LIPPITZ. (Attachments: #1 Entry of Default)(Philipps, David) Modified on 9/26/2019 (TMB).
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by CYNTHIA LIPPITZ. VIRTUOSO SOURCING GROUP, LLC served on 8/29/2019. (Philipps, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to VIRTUOSO SOURCING GROUP, LLC. (AKH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff CYNTHIA LIPPITZ. (Steinkamp, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff CYNTHIA LIPPITZ. (Robertson, Angie)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff CYNTHIA LIPPITZ. (Philipps, Mary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff CYNTHIA LIPPITZ. (Philipps, David)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VIRTUOSO SOURCING GROUP, LLC, filed by CYNTHIA LIPPITZ. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5594050) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - Bankruptcy Schedule E/F, #4 Exhibit Group D - Bankruptcy 341 Notice and excerpt of Schedule E/F, #5 Exhibit E - Collection Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIPPITZ v. VIRTUOSO SOURCING GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA LIPPITZ
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRTUOSO SOURCING GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Neal F. Bailen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?