MCMICHAEL v. FEDEX EMPLOYEE CREDIT ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: Paul McMICHAEL
Defendant: FEDEX EMPLOYEE CREDIT ASSOCIATION, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC and EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03573
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by FEDEX EMPLOYEE CREDIT ASSOCIATION.(Raebel, Seth)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(Hunter, Taylor)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2019 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/4/2019.(SWM)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Andrew Raebel on behalf of Defendant FEDEX EMPLOYEE CREDIT ASSOCIATION. (Raebel, Seth)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant FEDEX EMPLOYEE CREDIT ASSOCIATION. (Berry, Reynold)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FEDEX EMPLOYEE CREDIT ASSOCIATION. (Berry, Reynold)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Reynold T. Berry on behalf of Defendant FEDEX EMPLOYEE CREDIT ASSOCIATION. (Berry, Reynold)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent EXPERIAN PLC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Other Affiliate ONLINE DATA EXCHANGE LLC, Other Affiliate NEW MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate VANTAGESCORE SOLUTIONS LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC... (Hunter, Taylor)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Hunter, Taylor)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Hunter on behalf of Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Hunter, Taylor)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Lewis Seigel on behalf of Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Seigel, Leah)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A. Dixon on behalf of Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Dixon, Todd)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by G. John Cento on behalf of Plaintiff PAUL MCMICHAEL. (Cento, G.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., FEDEX EMPLOYEE CREDIT ASSOCIATION. (AKH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis W. Cohron on behalf of Plaintiff Paul McMICHAEL. (Cohron, Travis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Paul McMICHAEL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5594376) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Schedule D, #4 Exhibit B - EXP Disp Ltr, #5 Exhibit C- EXP RI Ltr)(Cohron, Travis) Modified on 8/26/2019 (AKH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCMICHAEL v. FEDEX EMPLOYEE CREDIT ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul McMICHAEL
Represented By: Travis W. Cohron
Represented By: G. John Cento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX EMPLOYEE CREDIT ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Reynold T. Berry
Represented By: Seth Andrew Raebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Todd A. Dixon
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Represented By: Leah Lewis Seigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?