STRAUB v. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC
Plaintiff: DAVID STRAUB
Defendant: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03577
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLOSED DISMISSED - ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Pursuant to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by the Plaintiff in this cause, this cause is hereby dismissed with prejudice, and each party shall bear its own respective costs and expenses, including but not limited to attorneys' fees, incurred in connection with this cause #7 . Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/23/2019.(JDH)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice, filed by Plaintiff DAVID STRAUB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of dismissal)(Steinkamp, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF A PLEADING AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. All that remains to be done is the execution of documents and/or delivery of funds, if so required, in accordance with their agreement. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/6/2019.(JRB)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. (AKH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID STRAUB. (Steinkamp, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC, filed by DAVID STRAUB. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5594832) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The February 19, 2019, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant pages of Plaintiff's August 13, 2019, Experian credit report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRAUB v. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID STRAUB
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?