DIXON v. PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC
Plaintiff: TIFFANY DIXON
Defendant: PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03579
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 CLOSED DISMISSED (Marginal Notation) - The Court acknowledges the Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, dkt. #11 , with each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 10/21/2019. (DWH)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by Plaintiff TIFFANY DIXON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of dismissal)(Steinkamp, John)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2019 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/8/2019.(SWM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC. (Ostroff, Ethan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC. (Ostroff, Ethan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff on behalf of Defendant PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC. (Ostroff, Ethan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by TIFFANY DIXON. PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC served on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Steinkamp, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC. (AKH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff TIFFANY DIXON. (Steinkamp, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC, filed by TIFFANY DIXON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5594978) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The December 7, 2018, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - The June 20, 2019, letters sent directly to Plaintiff, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIXON v. PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY DIXON
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?