DALE v. UPS et al
Plaintiff: DONNELL DALE
Defendant: UPS, LM INSURANCE CORP., JOSH WIFE, MICHAEL JONES, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, ADAM, ROBERT MORROW, JOSH and ANDREW W. COLE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03580
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UPS, ROBERT MORROW, MICHAEL JONES, ANDREW W. COLE, ADAM, JOSH, JOSH WIFE, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, filed by DONNELL DALE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Miscellaneous)(NAD)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF - It has come to the Court's attention that an exhibit attached to pro se Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. 1-2) contains Plaintiff's date of birth and/or social security number at pages 2 and 4. The Clerk of Court is directed to temporarily restrict the exhibit to case participants only. Local Rule 5-11(c)(2) provides: "When any of the confidential information in a document is irrelevant or immaterial to resolution of the matter at issue, the filing party may redact, by blacking out, the confidential information in lieu of filing under seal." If appropriate, Plaintiff is given leave to redact the confidential information and re-file the exhibit within twenty-one days of this notice. If a redacted version is not filed within twenty-one days, the case participants restriction will be removed. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/13/2019.(NAD)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY - GRANTING #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. For the reasons stated above, Dale's Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee (Filing No. #2 ) is GRANTED. Having screened the Complaint, the Court finds it is subject to dismissal for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Dale is granted leave to file an amended complaint by no later than Friday, October 18, 2019. If no amended complaint is filed by that date, this action will be dismissed for the reasons set forth above. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/13/2019. (NAD)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by DONNELL DALE. (NAD)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DONNELL DALE. (AKH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DONNELL DALE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Records, #2 Exhibit Resume; Education; Training Records)(AKH) Modified on 9/13/2019 (NAD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DALE v. UPS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM INSURANCE CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH WIFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT MORROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW W. COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNELL DALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?