MILLER v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: BARBARA A MILLER and BARBARA A. MILLER
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL, INC., COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS and COOK MEDICAL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03584
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
2 Judge: Doris L Pryor
3 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03112-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03113-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03114-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03115-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03116-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03128-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03129-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03130-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03146-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03147-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03148-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03548-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03561-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03562-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03564-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03566-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03567-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03568-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03569-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03584-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03592-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03600-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03601-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03112-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03113-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03114-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03115-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03116-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03128-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03129-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03130-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03146-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03147-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03148-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03548-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03561-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03562-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03564-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03566-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03567-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03568-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03569-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03584-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03592-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03600-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03601-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03584-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03585-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03587-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03592-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03600-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03601-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 9/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03584-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03585-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03587-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03592-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03600-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-03601-RLY-TAB(APD)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/13/2019.(APD)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff BARBARA A. MILLER. (Terry, Eric)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-03584-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (AKH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Terry on behalf of Plaintiff BARBARA A MILLER. (Terry, Eric)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, INC., WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, filed by BARBARA A MILLER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5595139) (Terry, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA A MILLER
Represented By: Eric M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA A. MILLER
Represented By: Eric M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL, LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?