E.H. v. GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: Jodie L., Eli H., Nathan H. and E. H.
Defendant: GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv03638
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff E. H. . (Curlin, Alexandra)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON JURISDICTION - The allegations in the complaint allege a basis for subject-matter jurisdiction, but it is unclear whether Defendant agrees that basis is sufficient. If Defendant contests jurisdiction, it SHALL FILE a jurisdictional statement by November 1, 2019, setting forth its basis for the objection. (See Order). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 10/9/2019.(JDH)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION.(Blevins, Sara)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2019 04:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/6/2019.(SWM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Elizabeth Jay on behalf of Defendant GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Jay, Emma)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Blevins, Sara)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R. Blevins on behalf of Defendant GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Blevins, Sara)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, DOCKETED IN ERROR, VIOLATES RULE 5-2*** Summons Issued as to GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (AKH) Modified on 8/29/2019 (PKP).
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiffs E.H., Nathan H., Jodie L.. (Curlin, Alexandra) Modified on 8/29/2019 (DWH).
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Marie Curlin on behalf of Plaintiffs E.H., Nathan H., Jodie L.. (Curlin, Alexandra) Modified on 8/29/2019 (DWH).
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service for Summons Supplied by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Waiver of Service of Summons) (Curlin, Alexandra) Modified on 8/29/2019 (PKP).
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Curlin, Alexandra)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5599560) (Curlin, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.H. v. GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENCASTLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: Sara R. Blevins
Represented By: Emma Elizabeth Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie L.
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Curlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli H.
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Curlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan H.
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Curlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. H.
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Curlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?