BEY et al v. EDWARD ROSE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC/EDWARD ROSE AND SONS
Plaintiff: B'ANCA VELORA DIORA BEY and TESSEMA-OSAZE: BEY
Defendant: EDWARD ROSE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC/EDWARD ROSE AND SONS
Case Number: 1:2019cv03684
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 CLOSED JUDGMENT - The court having this day made its Entry directing the entry of final judgment, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/21/2019. Copies Mailed.(CKM)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - DISMISSING COMPLAINT; Having failed to respond to the Court's orders by either paying the filing fee or demonstrating their inability to pay the filing fee, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Final judgment shall issue accordingly. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/21/2019. Copies Mailed.(CKM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Court Order, re #5 Order to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiff B'ANCA VELORA DIORA BEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CKM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of Foreign Affidavit of Fact, filed by Plaintiffs B'ANCA VELORA DIORA BEY, TESSEMA-OSAZE: BEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Envelope) (CKM)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On September 4, 2019, we ordered Plaintiffs to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate a lack of financial ability to do so by Monday, September 23, 2019. Plaintiff failed to do either. One day after the deadline, on September 24, 2019, Plaintiff B'Anca Velora Diora Bey filed a document titled "Affidavit of Truth of Financial Statement," but this document does not establish Plaintiffs' inability to pay the $400 filing fee. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to show cause by Wednesday, October 16, 2019 why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with court orders. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/2/2019. Copies Mailed. (CKM)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Submission of Affidavit of Truth of Financial Statement, filed by Plaintiff B'ANCA VELORA DIORA BEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CKM)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; The plaintiffs shall have through Monday, September 23, 2019 in which to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that they lack the financial ability to do so by submitting an affidavit setting forth the income and assets they possess, including that they are unable to prepay the fees, and stating their belief that they are entitled to redress. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/4/2019. Copies Mailed.(CKM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Affidavit of Fact and Discovery: Writ of Right) against EDWARD ROSE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC/EDWARD ROSE AND SONS, filed by TESSEMA-OSAZE: BEY, B'ANCA VELORA DIORA BEY. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Fact Alloidal Exhibit Sheet, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEY et al v. EDWARD ROSE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC/EDWARD ROSE AND SONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B'ANCA VELORA DIORA BEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TESSEMA-OSAZE: BEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD ROSE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC/EDWARD ROSE AND SONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?