COOPER v. PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: JERALD COOPER
Defendant: PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03725
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Cunningham on behalf of Defendant PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan I. Marcus on behalf of Defendant PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC.. (Marcus, Morgan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by JERALD COOPER. PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. served on 9/24/2019. (Shea, Richard)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony P. Chester on behalf of Plaintiff JERALD COOPER. (Chester, Anthony)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC.. (AKH)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff JERALD COOPER. (Shea, Richard)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, filed by JERALD COOPER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5607583) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - April 17, 2018 Billing Statement from PMH/Hamilton Emergency Physicians, #3 Exhibit 3 - The September 6, 2018 Dunning Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - The February 5, 2019 Dunning Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - The March 6, 2019 Dunning Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - The April 3, 2019 Dunning Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - The May 2, 2019 Dunning Letter, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOPER v. PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHOENIX FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERALD COOPER
Represented By: Richard John Shea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?