FOSTER v. BRENNAN et al
Plaintiff: LA VERNE FOSTER
Defendant: MEGAN J. BRENNAN and UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03735
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIPT #IP066945 for partial filing fee in the amount of $100.00, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of USM Service. Megan J. Brennan, Postmaster General, Washington DC was served on 9/27/2019 by CMRRR. (DWH)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of USM Service MEGAN J. BRENNAN served on 9/27/2019 c/o U.S. Post Office, Washington, DC. (MAC)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of USM Service MEGAN J. BRENNAN served on 9/30/2019 c/o U.S. Attorney, Southern IN. (MAC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Documents for service by USM - re #6 Summons Issued, #5 Order, #1 Complaint ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY - PAPER COPIES PROVIDED***. Electronic notice to USM-C.(DWH)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MEGAN J. BRENNAN, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form United States Attorney General, #2 USM 285 Form Office of the United States Attorney, #3 USM 285 Form United States Post Office, #4 USM 285 Form Megan J. Brennan, Postmaster Gen)(DWH)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by LA VERNE FOSTER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #2 Envelope) (DWH).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE - The clerk is directed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c) to issue process to Defendants. The Marshal for this District or his Deputy shall serve the summons, together with a copy of the complaint (dkt. 1) and a copy of this Order, on the defendants and officials designated under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i), at the expense of the United States. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/16/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - Ms. Foster's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is GRANTED. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). While in forma pauperis status allows Ms. Foster to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, she remains liable for the full fees. Ross v. Roman Catholic Archdiocese of Chicago, 748 F. App'x 64, 65 (7th Cir. Jan. 15, 2019) ("Under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), a district court may allow a litigant to proceed 'without prepayment of fees,'... but not without ever paying fees."). No payment is due at this time. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/16/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LA VERNE FOSTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - supporting documents)(REO)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MEGAN J. BRENNAN, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, filed by LA VERNE FOSTER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Witness List, #2 Admissions Exhibits (Index), #3 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Decision on Request for Reconsideration 06/26/19, #4 Exhibit 2 - EEOC Decision 12/19/2018, #5 Exhibit 3 - EEOC Formal Investigation Claim, #6 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of La Verne Foster and Supervisor Barbara Wooten, #7 Exhibit 5 - Letter to Plaintiff from US Department of Labor, #8 Exhibit 6 - E-mail from Plaintiff to USPS OIG Hotline Complaint, #9 Exhibit 7 - TACS-Database Printout, #10 Exhibit 8 - Acceptance for Supplemental Investigation, #11 Exhibit 9 - Transcript of Reginald Smithson, #12 Exhibit 10 - Transcript of Abraham L. Benjamin, Jr., #13 Exhibit 11 - Errata sheets from Abraham L. Benjamin, Jr. Deposition Testimony, #14 Exhibit 12 - Documents requested from Abraham L. Benjamin, Jr. in deposition, #15 Exhibit 13 - IMPD Downtown District Information Card and photo of Plaintiff's scar, #16 Exhibit 14 - EEO Events-Sexual Harrassment, Kathy Traverse/Gregory Stowers, #17 Exhibit 15 - EEO Investigative Affidavit (Witness) Manager Distribution Operations Toni L. Moore, #18 Exhibit 16 - EEO Investigative Affidavit (Witness) Senior Manager Distribution Operations Reginald Smithson, #19 Exhibit 17 - EEO Alternative Dispute Resolution Specialist's (ADR) Inquiry Report, #20 Exhibit 18 - Standard Form 50 dated 04-20-2005, #21 Exhibit 19 - Limited Duty Job Offers, #22 Exhibit 20 - Schedule Change effective 04/30/2016, #23 Exhibit 21 - Letter and 0-13 Memo/Routing Slip from Plaintiff to Union APWU-President, #24 Exhibit 22 - CA 110 Notes, #25 Exhibit 23 - Letter to Plaintiff from US Dept of Labor, #26 Exhibit 24 - 0-13 from Plaintiff dated 1 July 2016 to Injury Compensation, Dept of Labor and the Union, #27 Exhibit 25 - 0-13 from Plaintiff dated 15 August 2015, to Management, Injury Compensation, (MER)-Management-Employee-Relations, and the Union, #28 Exhibit 26 - Letter form Plaintiff to Linda Strong - USPS-HR-Injury Compensation Specialist dated 17 August, #29 Exhibit 27 - Letters and dates from Plaintiff, documents harassment from Abraham Benjamin Jr., #30 Exhibit 28 - Letter from Plaintiff to the US Dept of Labor dated 6 October 2014, #31 Exhibit 29 - Letter from Plaintiff to US Dept of Labor Claims Examiner MaryAnn Kramer, dated 08/01/2014, #32 Exhibit 30 - Letter from Plaintiff to US Dept of Labor Claims Examiner MaryAnn Kramer, dated 14 March 2015, #33 Exhibit 31 - CA-7 from Plaintiff, left on LWOP-Leave-without-pay, 4.79 hours, #34 Exhibit 32 - Plaintiff's letter from US Dept of Labor, #35 Exhibit 33 - Letter to Plaintiff from US Dept of Labor, dated 01/06/2015, #36 Exhibit 34 - Plaintiff's 3971's Leave slips, #37 Exhibit 35 - Plaintiff's leave and earnings statement dated 03/15/2013, #38 Exhibit 36 - Official supervisor's report of occupational disease, dated 07/21/2016, #39 Exhibit 37 - E-mail from APWU Union Steward to Senior MDO-Manager Distributions Operations-Reginald Smithson, #40 Exhibit 38 - USPS letter to Plaintiff, dated 05/26/2016, #41 Exhibit 39 - Letter to Plaintiff from the US Dept of Labor, dated 10/10/2014, #42 Exhibit 40 - Letter to Plaintiff from Supervisor Abraham Benjamin, dated September 24, 2015, #43 Exhibit 41 - EEO Alternative Dispute Rsolution Specialist's Inquiry, dated 07/28/2016, #44 Exhibit 42 - Supervisor's report and certification for Office of Personnel Management Disability Retirement, #45 Exhibit 43 - US Office of Personnel Management Retirement Services Programs Notice of Annuity Adjustment, #46 Exhibit 44 - Psychotherapy notes, dated September 20, 2016, #47 Exhibit 45 - IU Medical Group Primary Care - Letter from Dr. Susam Kiray, dated 08/04/2004, #48 Exhibit 46 - Letter from Plaintiff re: leave request and that Mr. Benjamin not process any of my leave, #49 Exhibit 47 - No agreement letter signed and dated by Albert Schinaz, mediator on 2 July 2016, #50 Exhibit 48 - APWU-American Postal Workers Union Grievance filed and denied by Supervisor Abraham Benjamin, dated 10/13/2015, #51 Exhibit 49 - USPS Management Work Schedule, dated 09/28/13 thru 10/04/2013, #52 Exhibit 50 - Training Report for Supervisor Abraham L. Benjamin Jr., #53 Exhibit 51 - RTR Employee Detail Report, #54 Exhibit 52 - Photo of file cabinets of Supervisor Abraham L. Benjamin Jr., #55 Exhibit 53 - NRP Activity File, #56 Exhibit 54 - Back Pay settlement, #57 Exhibit 55 - Defendant's discovery responses, #58 Exhibit 56 - USPS return to work policy)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOSTER v. BRENNAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGAN J. BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA VERNE FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?