POINTER et al v. LAWSON, ET AL
Plaintiff: DANIELLE POINTER, A. W. and D. P.
Defendant: OFFICER ROBERT LAWSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv03758
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by DANIELLE POINTER. ROBERT CARTER served on 10/30/2019. (Kinnard, Terrance)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to ROBERT CARTER, MARZETTA JENKINS. (NAD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to ROBERT CARTER. (Kinnard, Terrance)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MARZETTA JENKINS. (Kinnard, Terrance)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against MARZETTA JENKINS, ROBERT CARTER, ROBERT LAWSON filed by DANIELLE POINTER, D. P..(Kinnard, Terrance) Modified on 10/28/2019 - Added ROBERT LAWSON to mirror caption(NAD).
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ROBERT LAWSON. (DJH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Terrance Lamont Kinnard hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Kinnard, Terrance)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance Lamont Kinnard on behalf of Plaintiffs D. P., DANIELLE POINTER, A. W.. (Kinnard, Terrance)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against ROBERT LAWSON, filed by DANIELLE POINTER, A. W., D. P.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5611437) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kinnard, Terrance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POINTER et al v. LAWSON, ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ROBERT LAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE POINTER
Represented By: Terrance Lamont Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. W.
Represented By: Terrance Lamont Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. P.
Represented By: Terrance Lamont Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?