NAYLOR v. STAFFORD et al
Plaintiff: JOHN NAYLOR
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and STAFFORD
Case Number: 1:2019cv03767
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Submission of Memorandum of Law, filed by Plaintiff JOHN NAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Article titled "Solitary Confinement Reforms Sweeping the Nation but Still Not Enough")(NAD)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JOHN NAYLOR. (NAD)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court having this day issued its Entry directing the entry of final judgment, now enters FINAL JUDGMENT and this action is dismissed without prejudice. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/10/2019.(NAD)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order - Dismissing Action and Directing Entry of Final Judgment. Because the claims in this case are duplicative of those already proceeding in a previously- filed action, this action is dismissed. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #4 , and motion for assistance with recruiting counsel, dkt. #3 , are denied as moot. If Mr. Naylor wishes to identify factual allegations beyond those set forth in the complaint in No. 1:19-cv-3766-JMS- TAB, he should file an amended complaint in that case which sets forth all of his claims. Judgment dismissing this action without prejudice shall now issue. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/10/2019. (NAD)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCKETED TWICE TO GENERATE FORM*** NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (MEH)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by US Mail. (MEH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JOHN NAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Offender Transaction History)(REO)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel, filed by Plaintiff JOHN NAYLOR. (REO)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Tort Claim, filed by Plaintiff JOHN NAYLOR (REO)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, STAFFORD, filed by JOHN NAYLOR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit - Grievance documents, #3 Checklist for cases)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAYLOR v. STAFFORD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN NAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?