JOHNSON v. WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff: ALICIA JOHNSON
Defendant: WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03823
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff ALICIA JOHNSON . (Philipps, David)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2019 04:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/8/2019.(SWM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Trellis Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Trellis Ventures, Other Affiliate Texas Guranteed Student Loan Corporation, d/b/a Trellis Company for WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC.. (Burke, Brandi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC.(Burke, Brandi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandi L. Burke on behalf of Defendant WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC. (Burke, Brandi)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by ALICIA JOHNSON. WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC served on 9/16/2019. (Philipps, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff ALICIA JOHNSON. (Steinkamp, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC. (MAC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff ALICIA JOHNSON. (Robertson, Angie)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff ALICIA JOHNSON. (Philipps, Mary)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff ALICIA JOHNSON. (Philipps, David)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC, filed by ALICIA JOHNSON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5619661) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - Attorney Representation/Dispute Letter, #4 Exhibit D - excerpts of TransUnion Credit Report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA JOHNSON
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYPOINT RESOURCES GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?