MOUSSA v. LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC
Plaintiff: ZAKOU MOUSSA
Defendant: LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03845
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/6/2019. (GD)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Thomas M. Wilde for LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/24/2019. (SWM)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Grace L. Urban for LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Grace L. Urban is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to Grace L. Urban via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/24/2019. (SWM)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas M. Wilde to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5690974), filed by Defendant LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Thomas M. Wilde in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Heather)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Grace L. Urban to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5690879), filed by Defendant LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Grace L. Urban in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Heather)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Rulon on behalf of Defendant LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC. (Rulon, Jennifer)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC identifying Corporate Parent LSC Communications Inc for LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC.. (Wilson, Heather)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC.(Wilson, Heather)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L. Wilson on behalf of Defendant LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC. (Wilson, Heather)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by ZAKOU MOUSSA. LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC served on 9/11/2019. (Conteh, Swaray)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Swaray Edward Conteh on behalf of Plaintiff ZAKOU MOUSSA. (Conteh, Swaray)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC. (MAC)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC , filed by ZAKOU MOUSSA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5621967) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Conteh, Swaray) Modified on 9/11/2019 (MAC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOUSSA v. LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZAKOU MOUSSA
Represented By: Swaray Edward Conteh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSC COMMUNICATIONS US. LLC
Represented By: Heather L. Wilson
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Rulon
Represented By: Thomas M. Wilde
Represented By: Grace L. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?