MONTOUTH v. ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Girtie Montouth
Defendant: ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC. and Conduent Commercial Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03857
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC. identifying Corporate Parent ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC. for ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC... (Salisbury, Russell)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC. (LAB) (JDH)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC..(Salisbury, Russell)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE - This matter comes before the Court upon the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss Conduent Commercial Solutions, LLC Without Prejudice in the above-captioned matter as between Plaintiff Girtie Montouth and Defendant Conduent Commercial Solutions, LLC, pending binding arbitration. It is therefore ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that said Motion is hereby GRANTED and this matter is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Conduent Commercial Solutions, LLC, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs #13 . Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/1/2019. (JDH)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2019 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/31/2019.(SWM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Conduent Commercial Solutions, LLC, Without Prejudice, filed by Defendant CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberts, Tasha)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Morgan Salisbury on behalf of Defendant ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC.. (Salisbury, Russell)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC.. (Salisbury, Russell)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Conduent Incorporated for CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC.. (Roberts, Tasha)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Automatic Extension of Deadline for Responsive Pleading, filed by Defendant CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, re #1 Complaint. (Roberts, Tasha)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tasha Rebecca Roberts on behalf of Defendant CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Roberts, Tasha)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by GIRTIE MONTOUTH. CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC served on 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cummings, Paul)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by GIRTIE MONTOUTH. ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC. served on 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cummings, Paul)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, and ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC. (DJH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Girtie Montouth. (Cummings, Paul)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Girtie Montouth. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5623048) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cummings, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTOUTH v. ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCHE DIABETES CARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conduent Commercial Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Girtie Montouth
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?