WHITE v. DELEWARE CO SUPERIOR COURT
Plaintiff: ANTHONY T. WHITE
Defendant: DELEWARE CO SUPERIOR COURT
Case Number: 1:2019cv03868
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 CLOSED JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. The action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(iii). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/29/2019.(JDH)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT - This action is dismissed for failure to state a claim. The Order of September 16, 2019, dismissed the operative complaint because the defendant is immune from suit. Dkt. 4. The plaintiff was given a period of time in which to attempt to cure the deficiencies noted in that Order. The deadline has passed and the plaintiff has not responded. Therefore, this action is properly dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(iii). Judgment dismissing this action shall now issue. Copy to Anthony T. White via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/29/2019.(JDH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ANTHONY T. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS, DISMISSING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - In summary, the Court has 1) granted the plaintiff in forma pauperis status and assessed an initial partial filing fee, 2) directed the clerk to seal the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, 3) dismissed the complaint, and 4) given the plaintiff an opportunity amend his complaint or show cause why final judgment should not issue. (See Order). Copy to Anthony T. White via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/16/2019. (JDH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY T. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Inmate Trust Fund Account, #2 Envelope). (AKH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DELEWARE CO SUPERIOR COURT, filed by ANTHONY T. WHITE. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. DELEWARE CO SUPERIOR COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELEWARE CO SUPERIOR COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY T. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?