HICKS v. ON DEMAND STAFFING, INC.
Plaintiff: DALE HICKS
Defendant: ON DEMAND STAFFING, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03870
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/8/2019.(JRB)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ON DEMAND STAFFING, INC..(Helmond, Tyler)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler D. Helmond on behalf of Defendant ON DEMAND STAFFING, INC.. (Helmond, Tyler)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ON DEMAND STAFFING, INC. (DWH) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/13/2019) (DWH).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - Mr. Hicks's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #4 , is GRANTED. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). While in forma pauperis status allows Plaintiff to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, Plaintiff remains liable for the full fees. Ross v. Roman Catholic Archdiocese of Chicago, 748 F. App'x 64, 65 (7th Cir. Jan. 15, 2019) ("Under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), a district court may allow a litigant to proceed 'without prepayment of fees,'... but not without ever paying fees."). No payment is due at this time. The Clerk SHALL endorse and return the tendered summonses to Mr. Hicks's counsel, who is responsible for serving process. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/13/2019. (DWH)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff DALE HICKS. (Wolcott, Christopher)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Wolcott on behalf of Plaintiff DALE HICKS. (Wolcott, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against ON DEMAND STAFFING, INC., filed by DALE HICKS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolcott, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HICKS v. ON DEMAND STAFFING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ON DEMAND STAFFING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE HICKS
Represented By: Christopher S. Wolcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?