SCOTT v. MARION COUNTY SHERIFF DEPT. et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH LAMAR SCOTT, III
Defendant: AGENCIES OF INDIANA LAW ENFORCEMENT and MARION COUNTY SHERIFF DEPT.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03907
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint sent to KENNETH LAMAR SCOTT, III. ( Address Unknown) (CKM)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 Submission of Slandering, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH LAMAR SCOTT, III. (CKM)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AGENCIES OF INDIANA LAW ENFORCEMENT, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF DEPT., filed by KENNETH LAMAR SCOTT, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). (MAC)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of Letter re Prison Conditions, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH LAMAR SCOTT, III. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope) (CKM)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. He shall respond no later than Oct. 31, 2019. Should he choose to file an amended complaint and add more factual allegations, he shall do so by Oct. 31, 2019. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US MAil. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/2/2019.(JRB)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/2/2019. (JRB)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH LAMAR SCOTT, III. (MAC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AGENCIES OF INDIANA LAW ENFORCEMENT, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF DEPT., filed by KENNETH LAMAR SCOTT, III. (No fee paid with this filing). (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT v. MARION COUNTY SHERIFF DEPT. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGENCIES OF INDIANA LAW ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COUNTY SHERIFF DEPT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH LAMAR SCOTT, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?