STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. GREE USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: GREE USA, INC., ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. and GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI
Case Number: 1:2019cv03913
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard A. Schuster to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5713889), filed by Plaintiff STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Schuster Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schuster, Richard)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2019 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/6/2019.(SWM)
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process or, in the Alternative, Motion to Quash , filed by Defendant GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI. (Menyhart, Russell)
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process or, in the Alternative, Motion to Quash , filed by Defendant GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Amended Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process or, in the Alternative, Motion to Quash)(Menyhart, Russell) Modified on 11/4/2019 (LDH).
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., GREE USA, INC..(Menyhart, Russell)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process or, in the Alternative, Motion to Quash , filed by Defendant GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI. (Menyhart, Russell)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process or, in the Alternative, Motion to Quash, filed by Defendant GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process or, in the Alternative, Motion to Quash)(Menyhart, Russell)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI identifying Other Affiliate Gree Group for GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI.. (Menyhart, Russell)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent AB Electrolux for ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC... (Menyhart, Russell)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREE USA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Gree Electrical Appliance Inc. of Zhuhai, Other Affiliate MJC AMERICA D/B/A SOLEUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. for GREE USA, INC... (Menyhart, Russell)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Menyhart on behalf of Defendants ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI, GREE USA, INC.. (Menyhart, Russell)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Herceg on behalf of Defendants ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI, GREE USA, INC.. (Herceg, Manuel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Thornton Escoffery on behalf of Defendants ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI, GREE USA, INC.. (Escoffery, Erin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. served on 10/7/2019. (Smith, Stephen)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI served on 10/5/2019. (Smith, Stephen)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. GREE USA, INC. served on 10/8/2019. (Smith, Stephen)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Smith on behalf of Plaintiff STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Smith, Stephen)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI, GREE USA, INC.. (AKH)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5629130) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons 3 DEFENDANTS)(Smith, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. GREE USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE USA, INC.
Represented By: Erin Thornton Escoffery
Represented By: Russell Menyhart
Represented By: Manuel Herceg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Erin Thornton Escoffery
Represented By: Russell Menyhart
Represented By: Manuel Herceg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI
Represented By: Erin Thornton Escoffery
Represented By: Russell Menyhart
Represented By: Manuel Herceg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Stephen A. Smith
Represented By: Richard Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?